California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03164
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Aug 19, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 12:23 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Oppo Cell Phone Seized as FP&F No. 2024565400011302 ("Target Device 1") (1)
Terminated: 08/19/2024


Docket last updated: 08/22/2024 12:38 AM PDT
Monday, August 19, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Oppo Cell Phone Seized as FP&F No. 2024565400011302 ("Target Device 1"). (gac)
Related: [-]