Montana District Court
Judge:John Johnston
Case #: 2:24-cv-00086
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Terminated:Dec 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 1:19 AM MST
Defendant
The Nature Conservancy
Represented By
Tessa A. Keller
Garlington Lohn & Robinson, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurel D. Angell
Represented By
David L. Vicevich
Vicevich Law
contact info

GPO Nov 12 2024
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Vacate 17 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 16 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/12/2024. (KAH)
GPO Dec 02 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; TNCs Motion to Dismiss 7 is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the doctrine of forum non conveniens. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/2/2024. (TLO)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 order Judgment Tue 12/03 9:37 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (TLO)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 8 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/02 9:30 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; TNCs Motion to Dismiss7 is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the doctrine of forum non conveniens. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/2/2024. (TLO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Tue 11/12 11:56 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Vacate17 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 16 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/12/2024. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
17 17 motion Vacate Mon 11/11 10:44 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 16 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, . David L. Vicevich appearing for Plaintiff Laurel D. Angell. (Vicevich, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
16 16 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM Thu 11/07 3:58 PM
TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion7 MOTION to Dismiss : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 12/4/2024 at 01:30 PM at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthouse in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/7/2024. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/31 3:42 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/31 4:31 PM
Reply Deadline of 10/31/2024 Terminated; emailed chambers motion is ripe (TLO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 10/17 1:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Laurel D. Angell. (Vicevich, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 10/17 2:05 PM
Terminate Deadlines as to7 Response ddl 10/17/24. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
13 13 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Wed 10/02 1:00 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/22/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/22/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/22/2024. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 11:30 AM in Butte, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/2/2024. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** (ACC)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ - MT Wed 10/02 10:56 AM
Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ Pursuant to Standing Order BMM-33 and no objection having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 3:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Submission of Proposed Order - MT Thu 09/26 3:45 PM
Submission of Proposed Order re:7 MOTION to Dismiss . (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 09/26 3:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Severance Agreement
8 8 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Thu 09/26 3:41 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss - SDM Thu 09/26 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Tessa A. Keller appearing for Defendant The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
6 6 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 09/17 2:02 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
5 5 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Fri 09/13 8:14 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/27/2024. (ACC)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/13 8:11 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint or Responsive Pleading . The Nature Conservancy answer due 9/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/13/2024. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/12 11:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint or Responsive Pleading . Tessa A. Keller appearing for Defendant The Nature Conservancy. (Keller, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/21 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to The Nature Conservancy. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (MMS)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 08/21 9:22 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3314373 (MMS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Wed 08/21 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against The Nature Conservancy, filed by Laurel D. Angell. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons