Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:24-cv-01421
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 16, 2025 5:50 AM EST
Defendant
Hassan Mohammed
Defendant
Barbara Thacker
Represented By
Jonathan J. Bond
Bond Law
contact info
Douglas C. Bond
Bond Law
contact info
Defendant
Ronnie L. Wingate
Represented By
Neil S. McElroy
contact info
Defendant
Sandusky County Jail
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Raymond Alfred Runner
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Candice L. Rodriguez
Defendant
Brandon Pokersnik
Represented By
Justin M. Weatherly
Henderson, Mokhtari & Weatherly - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Ohio State Patrol
Represented By
Bryan B. Lee
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
James P. Reising
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Defendant
Motor Vehicle Department
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Raquel Molina
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
James F. Melle
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Jason Kiddey
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Nancy L. Jennings
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Donte M. Hanns
Represented By
Bryan B. Lee
Ohio Attorney General
contact info
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
James P. Reising
Office Of The Attorney General - Constitutional Offices
contact info
Defendant
Fremont Police Department
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Markus Finley
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Defendant
Judge Daniel L. Brudzinski
Represented By
Cooper D. Bowen
Montgomery Jonson
contact info
Defendant
Jay Bowers
Represented By
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Jennifer A. McHugh
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Anthony Davis
314 Morrison Street
Fremont, OH 43420

GPO Jan 22 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Defendants' 12,13,16,20,22 and 23 Motions to Dismiss be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED in its entirety. The Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/22/2025. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 1/22/2025. (B,JL)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
43 43 resp Opposition Thu 03/20 8:49 AM
Opposition to42 Motion to strike filed by Donte M. Hanns, Ohio State Patrol. Related [+]
Related: [-] ising, James
Thursday, March 06, 2025
42 42 motion Strike Thu 03/06 2:05 PM
Motion to strike filed by Plaintiff Wayne Anthony Davis. Related document(s)41 . (G,G)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
41 41 resp Opposition Mon 03/03 12:54 PM
Opposition to40 Motion to strike filed by Donte M. Hanns, Ohio State Patrol. Related [+]
Related: [-] ising, James
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
40 40 motion Strike Tue 02/18 11:39 AM
Motion to strike filed by Plaintiff Wayne Anthony Davis. Related document(s)39 . (G,G)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
39 39 resp Response Wed 02/12 3:58 PM
Response to38 Motion for Writ of Error Memorandum/Judgment Entry filed by Ohio State Patrol, Donte M. Hanns. Related [+]
Related: [-] ising, James
Thursday, January 30, 2025
38 38 motion Vacate Thu 01/30 3:54 PM
Motion for Writ of Error Memorandum/Judgment Entry filed by Plaintiff Wayne Anthony Davis. Related document(s)37 . (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
37 37 order Judgment Wed 01/22 10:16 AM
Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in this Court's36 Memorandum of Opinion, this action is dismissed. Further, the Court CERTIFIES pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/22/2025. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 1/22/2025. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
36 36 10 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Order on Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Wed 01/22 10:12 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that Defendants'12 ,13 ,16 ,20 ,22 and23 Motions to Dismiss be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED in its entirety. The Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 1/22/2025. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 1/22/2025. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
35 35 resp Reply Mon 01/20 4:39 PM
Reply in support of20 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Markus Finley, Raymond Alfred Runner, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Sandusky County Jail, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Jason Kiddey, Jay Bowers. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Thu 12/26 9:43 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'34 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants Markus Finley, Raymond Alfred Runner, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Sandusky County Jail, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Jason Kiddey, Jay Bowers Reply in Support of the20 Motion to Dismiss due by 1/27/2025. Judge James R. Knepp II on 12/26/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 12/26/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
34 34 motion Extension (other) Mon 12/23 2:52 PM
Motion for extension of time until 1/27/2025 to file reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Markus Finley, Raymond Alfred Runner, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Sandusky County Jail, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Jason Kiddey, Jay Bowers. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
33 33 resp Response Tue 12/17 3:19 PM
Response to23 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Join Co-Defendants' Motions filed by Wayne Anthony Davis.(H,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Page one of Motion to Join
32 32 resp Response Tue 12/17 3:16 PM
Response to20 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Wayne Anthony Davis.(H,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Page one of Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
31 31 resp Reply Tue 12/03 10:37 AM
Reply in support of22 Motion to dismiss and supporting memorandum for failure to state a claim filed by Barbara Thacker. (Bond, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
30 30 resp Reply Mon 11/25 12:02 PM
Reply in support of13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Daniel L. Brudzinski. (Bowen, Cooper)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 11/25 11:37 AM
Attorney Appearance by James P. Reising filed by on behalf of Ohio State Patrol, Donte M. Hanns. Related [+]
Related: [-] ising, James
28 28 resp Reply Mon 11/25 10:06 AM
Reply in support of12 Motion to dismiss all claims for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Ohio State Patrol, Donte M. Hanns. (Lee, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Fri 11/22 10:22 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's27 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants'16 ,20 ,22 , and23 Motions to Dismiss due by 12/23/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 11/22/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 11/22/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
27 27 motion Extension (other) Wed 11/20 3:15 PM
Motion for extension of time until 30 Days to File Documents in Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Wayne Anthony Davis, Document is unsigned. Related document(s)20 ,13 .(K,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum/Response to Bond Law Counselor for Defendants Motion to Dismiss
Friday, November 15, 2024
26 26 resp Opposition Fri 11/15 4:17 PM
Opposition to13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 resp Response Tue 11/12 4:55 PM
Response in Opposition to12 Motion to dismiss all claims for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
24 24 resp Response Tue 11/12 4:49 PM
Response to Defendant's13 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/28 7:27 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Join Co-Defendants' Motions filed by Defendant Ronnie L. Wingate. (McElroy, Neil)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/28 4:44 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Barbara Thacker. (Bond, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 10/28 4:41 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jonathan J. Bond filed by on behalf of Barbara Thacker. (Bond, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 10/18 12:39 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Jay Bowers, Markus Finley, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Raymond Alfred Runner, Sandusky County Jail. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Order on Motion for appointment of counsel Fri 10/04 12:32 PM
Order: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's18 Motion for Extension be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants'12 and13 Motions to dismiss DUE 11/15/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 10/4/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 10/4/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 motion Extension (other) Appointment of Counsel Mon 09/30 2:58 PM
Motion for extension of time to Respond to12 Motion to Dismiss and13 Motion to Dismiss for 30 days. Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff Wayne Anthony Davis. Related document(s)12 ,13 .(H,JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
Friday, September 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 09/27 1:34 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Raymond Alfred Runner's Answer due 10/28/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/27/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/27/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 09/20 2:41 PM
Attorney Appearance and Motion for Initial Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Answer by Teresa L. Grigsby filed by on behalf of Raymond Alfred Runner. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Fri 09/20 11:24 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Teresa L. Grigsby and Jennifer A. McHugh removed from case as to Defendant Motor Vehicle Department. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/20/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/20/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Party Thu 09/19 4:01 PM
Motion to dismiss party Brandon Pokersnik filed by Defendant Brandon Pokersnik. (Weatherly, Justin)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/19 3:59 PM
Defendant Brandon Pokersnik's Answer to1 Complaint,, filed by Brandon Pokersnik. (Weatherly, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/18 10:32 AM
Motion by Teresa L. Grigsby and Jennifer A. McHugh to withdraw as attorney for Defendant Motor Vehicle Department filed by Jay Bowers, Markus Finley, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Sandusky County Jail. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/17 11:56 AM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Daniel L. Brudzinski.(Bowen, Cooper)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Docket
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 09/16 2:48 PM
Motion to dismiss filed by Donte M. Hanns, Ohio State Patrol. (Lee, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/10 2:22 PM
Motion by Teresa L. Grigsby and Jennifer A. McHugh to withdraw as attorney for Donte M. Hanns filed by Jay Bowers, Markus Finley, Fremont Police Department, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Motor Vehicle Department, Sandusky County Jail. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 09/10 11:21 AM
Motion for extension of time until October 28, 2024 to answer , plead, or move filed by Defendant Ronnie L. Wingate. (McElroy, Neil)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 09/10 11:19 AM
Attorney Appearance by Neil S. McElroy filed by on behalf of Ronnie L. Wingate. (McElroy, Neil)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Tue 09/10 10:32 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'8 Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Answer. Defendants Jay Bowers, Markus Finley, Fremont Police Department, Donte M. Hanns, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Motor Vehicle Department, and Sandusky County Jail Answers DUE 10/28/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/10/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/10/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 09/10 11:28 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Ronnie L. Wingate's Answer DUE 10/28/2024. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/10/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/10/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Tue 09/10 4:00 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Teresa L. Grigsby and Jennifer A. McHugh removed from case as to Defendant Donte M. Hanns. Judge James R. Knepp II on 9/10/2024. Copy sent to Wayne Anthony Davis, 314 Morrison Street, Fremont, OH 43420 by regular U.S. Mail on 9/10/2024. (B,JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
8 8 motion Extension (other) Mon 09/09 2:35 PM
Motion for extension of time until 10/28/2024 to to move, plead or answer filed by Jay Bowers, Markus Finley, Fremont Police Department, Donte M. Hanns, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Raquel Molina, Motor Vehicle Department, Sandusky County Jail. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 08/28 4:39 PM
Original Summons issued at counter for service upon Barbara Thacker. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 1:55 PM
Amended complaint for Violation of Civil Rights with jury demand adding new party defendant Barbara Thacker. Filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 08/23 11:09 AM
Original Summons issued at counter for service upon Motor Vehicle Department, Ohio State Patrol, Sandusky County Jail. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (court event) Thu 08/22 1:55 PM
Notice of intent to use process server (unsigned) filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. (H,JL)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_doc Supplement (court event) Thu 08/22 1:52 PM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by Wayne Anthony Davis. Related document(s)1 . (H,JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 08/21 9:43 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued at counter for service upon Jay Bowers, Daniel L. Brudzinski, City of Fremont, Fremont Police Department, Markus Finley, Donte M. Hanns, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Hassan Mohammed, Raquel Molina, Brandon Pokersnik, Candice L. Rodriguez, Raymond Alfred Runner, Ronnie L. Wingate. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/21 9:37 AM
Complaint for violation of civil rights with jury demand against Jay Bowers, Daniel L. Brudzinski, Fremont Police Department, Markus Finley, Donte M. Hanns, Nancy L. Jennings, Jason Kiddey, James F. Melle, Hassan Mohammed, Raquel Molina, Motor Vehicle Department, Ohio State Patrol, Brandon Pokersnik, Candice L. Rodriguez, Raymond Alfred Runner, Sandusky County Jail, Ronnie L. Wingate. Filing fee paid. $405.00. Receipt # 14528. Filed by Wayne Anthony Davis.. (S,DM) Modified text on 8/21/2024 (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 08/21 9:40 AM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 08/21 9:40 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Wed 08/21 9:44 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (S,DM)
Related: [-]