Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:24-bk-04911
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Dismissed:Nov 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC
14851State Rd. 52 Suite 161
Hudson, FL 34669
Represented By
Buddy D Ford
Buddy D. Ford, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
32 32 trustee Ch 11 Subch V Case Trustee's Report of No Distribution B-case dism or conv, fee award recd Mon 03/10 12:07 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $1,000.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 7 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $0.00, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Trustee Kathleen L DiSanto. (DiSanto, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
31 31 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Wed 01/08 12:40 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Subchapter V Trustees Final Application for Compensation for Services Rendered for the Period of August 23, 2024 through December 5, 2024. Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Trustee Kathleen L DiSanto Related [+]. (DiSanto, Kathleen)
Related: [-] 30
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
30 30 order Compensation Tue 01/07 12:29 PM
Order Granting Application For Final Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Kathleen L DiSanto in the amount of $1575.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 Service Instructions: Kathleen DiSanto is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 28
Friday, December 06, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Fri 12/06 5:23 PM
Notice of Final Application for Compensation and Opportunity to Object and Request for Hearing Filed by Kathleen L DiSanto on behalf of Trustee Kathleen L DiSanto Related [+]. (DiSanto, Kathleen)
Related: [-] 28
28 28 motion Application for Compensation (incl. Quantum Meruit) Fri 12/06 5:21 PM
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
court Effect Dismissal Tue 11/19 3:00 PM
Dismissal Effected Pursuant to Order Dismissing Case Related [+]. (Lee Hue, Karla)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
27 27 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 11/06 4:27 PM
Proof of Service of of the Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss Case and Conditionally Dismissing Case. Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC Related [+]. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-] 26
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
26 26 order Ore Tenus Motion Wed 11/06 9:34 AM
Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss Case and Conditionally Dismissing Case Related [+]. Service Instructions: Buddy Ford is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 22
Thursday, October 31, 2024
25 25 misc Proof of Service (BK) Thu 10/31 8:57 AM
Proof of Service of Order Denying Creditor Trinity Tuscan Center, LLC's Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC Related [+]. (Bagge, Stephen)
Related: [-] 24
court ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day Thu 10/31 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order24 is not indicated on the docket. Stephen Bagge is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
24 24 order Relief from Stay Fri 10/25 4:44 PM
Order Denying Motion For Relief From Stay Related [+] filed by Trinity Tuscan Center, LLC Service Instructions: Stephen Bagge is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, October 21, 2024
23 23 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 10/22 1:16 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Buddy Ford; Kathleen DiSanto; Teresa Dorr; Steven Bagge WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: ***(1) STATUS CONFERENCE 1188(a) - CLOSED ***(2) Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay Re: Debtor's lease at 9040 Tryfon Blvd., A-101, Trinity, FL 34655 by TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC (Doc #17) - DENIED AS MOOT; ORDER BY BAGGE ***(3) Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss Case by Debtor; ORDER GRANTING; ORDER BY FORD Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Ore Tenus Motion (court use only) Tue 10/22 12:09 PM
Ore Tenus Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC (Wendy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK) Fri 10/11 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #20 )
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
20 20 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (BK) Tue 10/08 11:47 AM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing on STATUS CONFERENCE 1188(a) and Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. Re: Debtor's lease at 9040 Tryfon Blvd., A-101, Trinity, FL 34655. Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2024 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Anel)
Related: [-] 17 ,19 ,11
19 19 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (BK) Tue 10/08 9:48 AM
Notice Rescheduling Hearing STATUS CONFERENCE 1188(a), Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: Debtor's lease at 9040 Tryfon Blvd., A-101, Trinity, FL 34655. Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC (Doc #17) Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2024 at 10:15 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Dello Iacono, Ann)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, September 30, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing (BK) Mon 09/30 3:41 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 10:15 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Bagge, Stephen)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, September 27, 2024
court Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only Fri 09/27 3:07 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 10/17/2024 10:15 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. (Fee Paid.) Re: Debtor's lease at 9040 Tryfon Blvd., A-101, Trinity, FL 34655. Doc17 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Stephen J Bagge to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
17 17 motion Motion for Relief from Stay (not for amended motions) Tue 09/24 10:50 AM
Motion Compelling Payment of Post-Petition Rent and Alternative Motion for Relief from Stay. (Verify Fee) Re: Debtor's lease at 9040 Tryfon Blvd., A-101, Trinity, FL 34655. Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Tue 09/24 10:58 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK:8:24-bk-04911-RCT] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A76929297, Amount Paid $ 199.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
16 16 misc Pre-Status Conference Report Fri 09/20 1:58 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC. (Semach, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
trustee (NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Wed 09/11 11:56 AM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and concluded on 9/11/2024 . Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Dorr, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Wed 09/04 9:20 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Schedule A/B, Schedule E/F, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney, Summary of Assets, List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC Related [+]. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case
14 14 misc Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Wed 09/04 8:56 AM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , Schedule A/B,Schedule E/F,Schedule H, Includes addition or deletion of creditors, or executory contract entity/leaseholders, or co-debtors to Schedules or Change in the Amount or Classification of Debts. Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Statement of Financial Affairs , Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney , Summary of Assets , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC Related [+]. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-] 5
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 09/04 9:17 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Schedules (all schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)([LINK:8:24-bk-04911-RCT] ) [misc,schaja] ( 34.00). Receipt Number A76688752, Amount Paid $ 34.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Fri 08/30 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 08/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 08/29 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #10 )
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf Tue 08/27 10:00 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 10:15 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Cathy P.)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 court 341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline Mon 08/26 12:34 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/11/2024 at 11:00 AM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 10/30/2024. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/26 11:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen J Bagge on behalf of Creditor TRINITY TUSCAN CENTER, LLC. (Bagge, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 24, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 08/25 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 08/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 3 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Fri 08/23 8:46 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee . Kathleen L DiSanto added to the case. Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 9/11/2024 11:00 a.m. telephonically via US Trustee - Tampa/Ft. Myers. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Dorr, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 misc Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Thu 08/22 1:10 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Deficient Filing (BK) Thu 08/22 12:48 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Summary of Assets, Schedules A/B, E/F, H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Small Business Balance Sheet, Case Management Summary . (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Wed 08/21 3:24 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs motion Application to Employ/Retain Wed 08/21 3:24 PM
Application to Employ Buddy D. Ford, P. A. as Counsel for Debtor Contains negative notice. Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Application to Employ
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 08/21 3:07 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 08/21 3:06 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules D G, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Bella Ragazza Salon, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 11/19/2024. (Ford, Buddy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Wed 08/21 3:22 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:24-bk-04911] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A76514556, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Wed 08/21 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]