District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:24-cv-02423
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:19 AM EST
Defendant
XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By
Erika Kirstie Oblea
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
ALBINA HEAD START, INC.
Represented By
Edward T. Waters
Feldesman Leifer LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 8 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2025. (lcrc3)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
23 23 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 04/08 7:19 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re22 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/08 9:53 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5106 for22 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by ALBINA HEAD START, INC.. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
22 22 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 04/07 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to20 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,21 Memorandum & Opinion, by ALBINA HEAD START, INC.. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ADCDC-11595074. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
21 21 18 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 03/05 6:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION denying7 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting8 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 03/05 6:24 PM
ORDER denying7 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting8 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting13 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/5/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Thu 02/27 4:29 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA. (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 02/21 12:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA. (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 02/21 2:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report within five days of the issuance of any notice of funding opportunity, or by March 7, 2025, whichever comes first, to update the Court on the status of the solicitation. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/21/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 02/07 2:54 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA. (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 02/07 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report within five days of the issuance of any notice of funding opportunity, or by February 21, 2025, whichever comes first, to update the Court on the status of the solicitation. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/7/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
order .Order Fri 01/31 4:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At the status conference held before the Court on January 10, 2025, the Government informed the Court that it expected a notice of funding opportunity to be posted on or about January 23, 2025. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, on or before February 7, 2025, advising the Court whether the solicitation has been opened. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/31/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
minutes Status Conference Mon 01/13 6:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 1/10/2025. Parties discuss the status of this action. (Court Reporter: Tim Miller.) (tj)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 01/06 3:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consent of the parties, the status conference currently scheduled for January 9, 2025 at 10am is hereby RESCHEDULED for January 10, 2025 at 3:30pm before Judge Rudolph Contreras via zoom video. (So Ordered Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/6/25). (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Hearing Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/20 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting15 the motion to schedule a hearing in this matter, and Status Conference will be held on 1/9/2025 at 10:00 AM in before Judge Rudolph Contreras via zoom video. Parties participating in this matter will receive a zoom invitation prior to the scheduled hearing. (So Ordered Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/20/24) (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
16 16 8 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 12/17 5:31 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re13 Motion for Leave to File,, filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Heather Wanderski,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Wanderski Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Wanderski Declaration,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 motion Hearing Thu 12/12 12:12 PM
MOTION for Hearing Request for Scheduling Conference by ALBINA HEAD START, INC.(Waters, Edward) Modified event on 12/12/2024 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 misc Joint Appendix Wed 12/04 2:00 PM
JOINT APPENDIX Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(n) by ALBINA HEAD START, INC..(Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Cited Pages from Administrative Record
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
13 13 respm Surreply Tue 12/03 4:24 PM
SURREPLY to Defendants' Reply Memorandum - Motion for Leave to File Surreply filed by ALBINA HEAD START, INC..(Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Surreply in Response to Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt No 12),
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Surreply (OHS Letter),
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Letter (11.27.24),
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Response Letter (12.02.24)
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 11/26 12:22 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA. (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
11 11 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 11/13 1:53 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALBINA HEAD START, INC.. (Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
10 10 21 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 11/13 1:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALBINA HEAD START, INC.. (Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 10/30 4:06 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re7 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 motion Summary Judgment Wed 10/30 4:05 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, XAVIER BECERRA.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
7 7 motion Summary Judgment Wed 10/16 2:24 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBINA HEAD START, INC..(Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/02 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record by XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Certified List of Contents of Administrative Record,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 20, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/20 5:23 PM
ORDER granting4 Joint Proposed Expedited Briefing Schedule and Joint Motion to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Respond to1 Complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/20/2024. (lcrc1)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Briefing Schedule Stay Fri 09/20 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule , Joint MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint by XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Oblea, Erika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 08/22 9:41 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/22 9:37 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/21 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Xavier Becerra (in his official capacity only) ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11107438) filed by ALBINA HEAD START.(Waters, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to HHS,
Att: 3 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney,
Att: 5 Summons Summons to Becerra