Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Michael J Frank
Case #: 5:24-cv-00186
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:21 AM EST
Defendant
CITY OF PANAMA CITY
Represented By
GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS
Coppins Monroe Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
NICHOLAS ARTHUR LECAKES
Coppins Monroe Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Defendant
MARK SMITH
Represented By
GWENDOLYN PALMER ADKINS
Coppins Monroe Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
NICHOLAS ARTHUR LECAKES
Coppins Monroe Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK LARAMORE
Represented By
BRIAN O'SHEA FINNERTY
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
MARIE A MATTOX
Mattox Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
14 14 misc Docket Annotation Thu 05/22 9:57 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re11 Notice of Filing Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by CITY OF PANAMA CITY, MARK SMITH.(Clerk received one thumb drive containing exhibits in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.11 ). These are Exhibits 19(Doc. 11-19) and Exhibits 23 through 26 (Doc. 11-23 through 11-26) respectively. (Thumb drive sealed in envelope and placed in cabinet.) (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 05/22 3:33 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: 14 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re11 Notice of Filing Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by CITY OF PANAMA CITY, MARK SMITH.(Clerk received one thumb drive containing exhibits in support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.11 ). These are Exhibits 19(Doc.11 -19) and Exhibits 23 through 26 (Doc.11 -23 through11 -26) respectively. (Thumb drive sealed in envelope and placed in cabinet.) (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Wed 05/21 2:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CITY OF PANAMA CITY, MARK SMITH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 6/11/2025) . (LECAKES, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 05/20 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Exhibit 1 in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by CITY OF PANAMA CITY, MARK SMITH re11 Notice (Other),,,,,,, (LECAKES, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit 1 - Code of Ordinances Division 3 - Police Department
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 05/20 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by CITY OF PANAMA CITY, MARK SMITH (LECAKES, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Code or Ordinances Article VII City Manager [Bates 557-558],
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition of Chief Smith, Excerpts,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Jared Jones, Excerpts,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of John Moore, Excerpts,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition of Paul Powell, Excerpts,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition of Plaintiff, Excerpts,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Sheriff Ford, Excerpts,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - General Order 200.01(I) Command Structure [Bates 668-682],
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - General Order 207.00 Code of Conduct [Bates 414-433],
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - General Order 215.00 Speech Policy [Bates 663-667],
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - General Order 225.00 Internet Usage [Bates 559-579],
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - City of Panama City Administrative Personnel Policies [Bates 440-486],
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Email from Plaintiff to Citizen Aug 16, 2022 [Bates 9],
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Email from Plaintiff to Citizen Aug 20, 2022 [Bates 8],
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - Email from Plaintiff to Reply Aug 21, 2022 [Bates 7],
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Termination Letter Aug 26, 2022 [Bates 6],
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Resignation Aug 29, 2022 [Bates 5],
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiffs Oath of Office [Bates 12],
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - Video - Laramore Body Cam Video,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - City of Panama City Police Department Statement [Bates 395],
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - Administrative Complaint 22-19 [Bates 397-411],
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - Complaints to City re Plaintiff [Bates 499-516],
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Audio Laramore19,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Audio Laramore24,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Audio Laramore25,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Audio Laramore60,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Personnel Action Form [Bates 660-661]`,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Internet Archive Snapshot June 27, 2022
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Notice of Mediation re Scheduling Mon 04/07 8:31 AM
Third NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by MARK LARAMORE (MATTOX, MARIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MARK SMITH, CITY OF PANAMA CITY from Circuit Court, Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Bay County, Florida, case number 2024-CA-000428. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8964985.), filed by MARK SMITH, CITY OF PANAMA CITY. (ADKINS, GWENDOLYN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DOCKET,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - CIVIL COVER SHEET-STATE,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - COMPLAINT,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - SUMMONS ISSUED - CITY,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - SUMMONS ISSUED - SMITH,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - FEE PAYMENT RECEIPT,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - RETURN OF SERVICE - CITY,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - RETURN OF SERVICE - SMITH,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - GPA,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - ADDITIONAL - LECAKES,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - ADKINS,
Att: 14 Exhibit N - DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - ADDITIONAL - LECAKES,
Att: 15 Exhibit O - NOTICE OF REMOVAL - STATE