California Central District Court
Judge:Serena R Murillo
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 2:24-cv-07100
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Property Damage (P.I.)
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Case in other court:Santa Barbara County Superior Court, 24CV03331
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 12:18 AM PST
Defendant
Courtney DeSoto
Represented By
Dan Leroy Longo
Murchison And Cumming LLP
contact info
Dan L Longo
Murchison And Cumming LLP
contact info
Sean S Twomey
Murchison And Cumming, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Indu H. Harwin
Represented By
Robert B Locke
Law Office Of Robert B. Locke
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/17 2:19 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Serena R. Murillo: The Court, having been advised that this action has been resolved by a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal17 , hereby orders this action dismissed with prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. Any pending Order to Show Cause is hereby discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Thu 03/13 1:10 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Indu H. Harwin.(Locke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 11:09 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Serena R. Murillo. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Thu 02/27 12:35 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-039) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Serena R. Murillo, this case is transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to the calendar of Judge Serena R. Murillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-07100 SRM(Ex). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 19 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/23 4:10 PM
ORDER RE: CIVIL JURY/COURT TRIAL I. SCHEDULE II. TRIAL PREPARATION III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2025. Discovery cut-off 4/18/2025. Exhibit List due by 7/25/2025. Witness List due by 7/25/2025. Motions due by 5/23/2025. Motions in Limine to be filed by 7/25/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2025. Status Report due by 7/25/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 6/6/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2025 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Jury Trial set for 9/2/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 10/23 2:28 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/6/2025. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 10/22 1:57 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 10/25/2024, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 10/10 4:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto..(Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 09/04 9:38 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 09/03 2:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto.(Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 09/03 10:36 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 08/29 4:05 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Courtney DeSoto answer now due 9/3/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto.(Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 08/22 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/21 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto, identifying London Fischer, LLP, Channel Islands Fiduciary Group. (Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/21 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto. (Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of Santa Barbara, case number 24CV03331 Receipt No: ACACDC-38069672 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Courtney DeSoto. (Attorney Sean S Twomey added to party Courtney DeSoto(pty:dft))(Twomey, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Sean S. Twomey in Support of Notice of Removal of Civil Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint for Damages,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit 6/24/24 Proof of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit 8/12/24 Proof of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit Printout of State Court Docket for Case
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 08/22 3:02 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Courtney DeSoto, Does, filed by Plaintiff Indu H. Harwin. (FILED IN SANTA BARBARA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/12/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 08/22 3:08 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Indu H. Harwin, upon Defendant Courtney DeSoto served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yanki Evilyaoglu, Administrative Assistant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. (FILED IN SANTA BARBARA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/24/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]