New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:24-cv-05596
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
Global Widget
Represented By
Trenton Leigh
Solomon Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Kenneth Charles Murphy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Joseph Thomas Niczky
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Stanford R. Solomon
The Solomon Tropp Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Supplement Manufacturing Partner
Represented By
Trenton Leigh
Solomon Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Nicole Haff
Lewis & Lin LLC
contact info
Brett Evan Lewis
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info
Jane Jihyun Jaang
Lewis & Lin
contact info
Anna Iskikian
Lewis & Lin LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/12 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shuyu Wang on behalf of Supplement Manufacturing Partner (aty to be noticed) (Wang, Shuyu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
53 53 misc Transcript Wed 05/07 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 30, 2025, before Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc., Telephone number 917-817-2825. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/28/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
52 52 respoth Reply in Opposition Tue 05/06 12:00 PM
REPLY in Opposition re50 Letter Requesting Early Summary Judgment filed by Supplement Manufacturing Partner. (Iskikian, Anna)
Related: [-]