Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-03694
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy
Represented By
D. Michael Williams
Hall Booth Smith, P.C. - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Represented By
Paul W Sheldon
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser P.C.
contact info
Paul L Myers
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Octavious Mann
2020 Howell Mill Rd. NW Apt C130
Atlanta, GA 30318


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/11 2:09 PM
ORDER adopting28 Report and Recommendation; denying as moot5 Motion to Dismiss ; denying9 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against the Law Office are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to be re-filed in a proper jurisdiction. The case will proceed solely on Plaintiffs claims against Trans Union. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/11/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/11 2:13 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Octavious Mann re39 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 04/08 9:13 AM
Submission of28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/14 12:19 PM
Submission of35 Scheduling Order - Deadline for Plaintiff's CIP to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
38 38 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 1:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Plaintiff filed by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 1:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures filed by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/03 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Myers on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 3:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:34 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Case assigned to a six-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 7/28/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 3/3/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/03 3:14 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Octavious Mann re35 Scheduling Order. (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
34 34 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 03/03 8:55 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
33 33 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/28 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Monarch Apartment Homes by Trans Union, LLC.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 02/28 1:29 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/27 7:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Trans Union, LLC.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
30 30 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/27 7:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery to Plaintiff by Trans Union, LLC.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Fri 02/14 3:24 PM
ORDER for Service of28 Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 2/14/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 02/14 3:22 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re23 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy,9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy filed by Octavious Mann,26 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy,5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC,19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment9 be DENIED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Trans Union's Motion to Dismiss5 be DENIED as moot, and that the Law Offices First Motion to Dismiss19 and Second Motion to Dismiss23 be DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Law Office's Third Motion to Dismiss26 be GRANTED for lack of personal jurisdiction, and that the Plaintiffs claims case against the Law Office be DISMISSED without prejudice to being re-filed in a proper jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 2/14/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/14 3:25 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Octavious Mann re29 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re23 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy,9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy filed by Octavious Mann,26 Second. (gww)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 02/14 3:38 PM
ORDER: In the event that these Recommendations are adopted in full, this case will proceed solely on Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Trans Union. Plaintiff and Trans Union are ORDERED to file their respective portions of the JPR within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a CIP within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Ruling by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand within R&R28 . (gww) Modified on 2/14/2025 (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/15 1:46 PM
Submission of26 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 12/27 2:05 PM
ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/27/2025.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 12/27 11:40 AM
Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy.(Williams, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Dimsiss,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Jennifer McCoy
Monday, December 16, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 12/16 11:08 AM
Submission of23 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/13 4:32 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy, Trans Union, LLC filed by Octavious Mann.(gww)
Related: [-]
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/13 4:23 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, attached to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend12 at pages 8-99. Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file an answer or other response to the Amended Complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/13/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/13 4:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Octavious Mann re24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/27 2:58 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy.(Williams, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss
Monday, November 25, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 11:35 AM
Submission of19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/18 2:32 PM
Submission of12 MOTION Leave to File Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
22 22 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/07 1:36 PM
Return of Service Executed by Octavious Mann. The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
21 21 service Summons Issued Wed 11/06 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy. (gww)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 11/06 2:19 PM
Clerk's Notation re20 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/05 3:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy. (Williams, D.)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 11/05 12:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy.(Williams, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/30 7:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/31 2:15 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Certificate of Service by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Return of Service Executed Thu 10/31 2:13 PM
Return of Service Executed by Octavious Mann. The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy served on 10/26/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
16 16 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 10/31 2:12 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Octavious Mann.(gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, October 28, 2024
14 14 misc Mail Returned Tue 10/29 10:23 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to The Law Offices of Jennifer McCoy c/o Jennifer McCoy, Registered Agent re11 Order to Show Cause. Return to Sender. Attempted - Not Known. Unable to Forward. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 10/25 1:24 PM
Summons Issued as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/18 10:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
11 11 6 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 10/16 12:45 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, why service upon the Law Office was legally valid and why the Motion For Default Judgment9 should not be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 10/16/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/16 12:50 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Octavious Mann, The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy re11 Order to Show Cause. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 10/07 11:33 AM
Submission of9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy,5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/03 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 09/19 2:55 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy by Octavious Mann.(gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Clerks Entry of Default Thu 09/19 2:54 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/19 2:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Octavious Mann. (gww)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 09/19 1:49 PM
Clerk's Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Entry of Default Thu 09/19 2:56 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy. (gww)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/12 5:39 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transunion, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Dismiss Thu 09/12 5:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by Trans Union, LLC.(Myers, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 08/22 3:03 PM
Return of Service Executed by Octavious Mann. Trans Union, LLC served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Thu 08/22 3:01 PM
Return of Service Executed by Octavious Mann. The Law Office of Jennifer McCoy served on 8/22/2024, answer due 9/12/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/21 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/21 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100013716) filed by Octavious Mann.(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet