Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:24-cv-01299
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Aug 19, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 15, 2025 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Antony J Blinken
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Christine Elder-Sydney
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro N Mayorkas
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Defendant
Julie M Stufft
Represented By
Michelle R. Lambert
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info
Plaintiff
Elham Parsaei
E-Filing/Service 3517 171ST ST SW
LYNNWOOD, WA 98037


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case Tue 11/05 4:23 PM
ORDER granting Parties'17 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. The case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 11/05 10:24 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and [Proposed] Order , filed by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Julie M Stufft, Christine Elder-Sydney. Noting Date 11/5/2024, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/30 9:20 AM
ORDER granting Parties'15 Stipulated Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 11/12/2024. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 10/29 10:31 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Hold Case in Abeyance and [Proposed] Order , filed by Defendants Antony J Blinken, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Julie M Stufft, Christine Elder-Sydney. Noting Date 10/29/2024, (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 10/08 3:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Antony J. Blinken Secretary, U.S. Department of State, et al. on 10/3/2024, filed by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei. (Parsaei, Elham)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
13 13 misc Praecipe to Attach Document Wed 10/02 6:15 AM
PRAECIPE to attach document re3 Complaint by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei(Parsaei, Elham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint 1,
Att: 2 Complaint 2,
Att: 3 Complaint 3,
Att: 4 Complaint 4,
Att: 5 Complaint 5,
Att: 6 Complaint 6
Friday, September 27, 2024
12 12 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Fri 09/27 7:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, an extension of time for the initial scheduling deadlines is granted. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/30/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2024, Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2024. Failure to adhere to this deadline may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
11 11 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Fri 09/06 10:57 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/27/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/11/2024, Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2024. (DS)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants Antony J Blinken, Christine Elder-Sydney, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Julie M Stufft. (Lambert, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 08/28 3:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Antony J. Blinken Secretary, U.S. Department of State, et al. on 8/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei. (Parsaei, Elham)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 08/28 3:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Antony J. Blinken Secretary, U.S. Department of State, et al. on 8/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei. (Parsaei, Elham)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Wed 08/28 3:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Antony J. Blinken Secretary, U.S. Department of State, et al. on 8/26/2024, filed by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei. (Parsaei, Elham)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Mon 08/26 8:04 AM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Elham Parsaei has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
5 5 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Thu 08/22 8:34 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 4:52 PM
Summons(es) Issued in Paper Form as to defendant(s) Antony J Blinken, Christine Elder-Sydney, Alejandro N Mayorkas, Julie M Stufft. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 08/20 4:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by Elham Parsaei. (SB)
Related: [-] ceipt # SEA 200005500
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Tue 08/20 1:43 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/19/2024 to correct IFP application (cc: Letter and IFP to plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 08/20 4:31 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 405.00, receipt number SEA 200005500. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
1 1 misc Proposed Document(s) Tue 08/20 1:40 PM
PROPOSED Complaint for Civil Case filed by Plaintiff Elham Parsaei. (No IFP/No Filing Fee) (CR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 PROPOSED Summons,
Att: 3 Email Filing of Case