Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cr-04434
Typecriminal / direct criminal
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 08/22/2024 12:56 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Criminal case docketed. Originating case number: 1:24-cr-00061-CMH-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/16/2024. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001622752] 24-4434 CH [Entered: 08/21/2024 11:47 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Robert A. Feitel, Mr. Joseph Douglas King - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 09/05/2024 Originating case number: 1:24-cr-00061-CMH-1. Mailed to: Robert Feitel. [1001622760] 24-4434 CH [Entered: 08/21/2024 11:52 AM]
Related: [-]