Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:24-cv-02599
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
A1 Master Trading LLC, NJ
Represented By
Mark Thomas Freeman
Freeman And Fuson
contact info
Defendant
Cheng Zhang
Represented By
Mark Thomas Freeman
Freeman And Fuson
contact info
Plaintiff
Federal Express Corporation
3620 Hacks Cross Road Building B 3rd Floor
Memphis, TN 38125
Represented By
Thomas Whitelaw Murrey, Jr.
Federal Express Corporation-Hacks Cross Rd
contact info
Jason Bernhardt
Federal Express Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
32 32 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 05/20 9:12 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to Counter-Plaintiff's counterclaim by Federal Express Corporation.(Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Thursday, May 08, 2025
31 31 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 05/08 12:26 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Federal Express Corporation by All Defendants.(Freeman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Pricing Agreement
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Mon 05/05 5:33 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendants move unopposed to extend the deadline to file an amended answer. (ECF No. 29.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Motion. The Court GRANTS Defendants leave of Court to amend their Answer. Defendants have through May 8, 2025, to file the amended answer. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/5/2025. (amo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
29 29 motion Extend Deadline Thu 05/01 4:37 PM
MOTION to Extend Deadline by All Defendants. (Freeman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
28 28 adr Consent to Mediation Tue 04/01 12:51 PM
CONSENT to Mediation by Federal Express Corporation(Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 4:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 03/06/2025. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Setting Letter Thu 03/06 2:06 PM
NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, June 22, 2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 3-4 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, May 15, 2026. Pretrial Conference has been set for Friday, May 29, 2026 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
Related: [-]
25 25 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 2:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status/Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 3/6/2025. Jason Bernhardt appeared for the plaintiff(s). Mark T. Freeman appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. A Jury Trial has been set for Monday, June 22, 2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Trial expected to last approximately 3-4 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, May 15, 2026. Pretrial Conference has been set for Friday, May 29, 2026 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips)(smm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 02/26 4:22 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
23 23 notice Setting Letter - Teams Fri 01/31 9:50 AM
NOTICE SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, March 6, 2025 at 2:00 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order to ECF_Judge_Parker@tnwd.uscourts.gov at least seven (7) days before the scheduling conference. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
22 22 order Order Thu 01/30 2:53 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] On December 23, 2024, Plaintiff moved for entry of default. (ECF No. 12.) Defendant then answered the lawsuit and opposed the Motion for Entry of Default. (ECF Nos. 14, 17.) Plaintiff has since filed a Notice stating that it withdraws its Motion for Entry of Default due to an agreement reached by the Parties. (ECF No. 21.) Accordingly, the Court will terminate the Motion and set a scheduling conference in this matter. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/30/2025. (amo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/28 1:02 PM
NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation re12 MOTION for Entry of Default Withdrawal of Request for Entry of Clerk's Default (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/15 3:46 PM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiff moves unopposed for leave to file a reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for entry of default. (ECF No. 19.) Plaintiff also requests a two-week extension to file the reply. (Id.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Plaintiff has until January 29, 2025, to file a reply. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/15/2025. (mkm)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/15 9:31 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Response in Opposition to Motion Proposed Order Submitted by Federal Express Corporation. (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/14 9:19 AM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] At present, Mr. Thomas Whitelaw Murrey, Jr. is listed on the docket as counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff explains that Mr. Murrey has passed away. (ECF No. 16.) Plaintiff thus moves to remove Mr. Murrey's name from the docket and designate Jason R. Bernhardt as Plaintiff's lead counsel in this matter. (Id.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court respectfully DIRECTS the Clerk to remove Mr. Murrey as counsel of record for Plaintiff and to list Jason R. Bernhardt as the sole and lead counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 1/14/2025. (amo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 5:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by All Defendants. (Freeman, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/08 9:26 AM
MOTION Amend Lead Counsel Designation Proposed Order Submitted by Federal Express Corporation.(Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
15 15 minutes Status Conference Tue 01/07 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 1/7/2025. Jason Bernhardt appeared for the plaintiff(s). Mark T. Freeman appeared for the defense. The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. Defense Counsel to file a response to the Motion for Entry of Default12 . The court will set a scheduling conference at a later date if needed. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (smm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 3:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Freeman, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/30 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance (Freeman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
12 12 motion Entry of Default Mon 12/23 11:15 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Federal Express Corporation. (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 notice Setting Letter - Teams Thu 12/19 11:09 AM
TEXT NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): A Status Conference has been set for Tuesday, January 7, 2025 at 2:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Express Corporation as to Cheng Zhang. (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Bernhardt on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Certificate of Service Wed 09/04 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Express Corporation as to A1 Master Trading LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Express Corporation (Bernhardt, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 08/22 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to A1 Master Trading LLC, Cheng Zhang. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 08/22 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 08/22 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Thu 08/22 2:37 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/22 2:35 PM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Summons Thu 08/22 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Summons by Thomas Whitelaw Murrey, Jr on behalf of Federal Express Corporation.(Murrey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/22 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT Original Complaint by Federal Express Corporation against A1 Master Trading LLC and Cheng Zhang a/k/a Peter Zhang against Federal Express Corporation (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4488353), filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Murrey, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet