Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-16800

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:24-ap-01534
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Emerald G Platzer
15 Southgate Drive
Howell, NJ 07731
Represented By
Emerald G Platzer
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen E. Bezner
567 Park Avenue, Suite 103
Scotch Plains, NJ 07076
Represented By
Karen E. Bezner
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
court Hearing Held Thu 12/12 1:39 PM
Minute of 12/12/2024; Hearing Held, OUTCOME: DISCONTINUED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Pre-Trial hearin
Thursday, November 21, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 11/21 12:27 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/21/2024; Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Karen E. Bezner for Service on Emerald G Platzer Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held (wdr) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2024 (wdr).
Monday, October 28, 2024
5 5 court Determination of Adjournment Request Mon 10/28 3:38 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to DECEMBER 12, 2024 at 10:00 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. Related [+] (wiq)
Related: [-] 2 PRE TRIAL HEARING
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 10/28 11:02 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Karen E. Bezner for Service on Emerald G Platzer Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2024 (wdr).
Thursday, September 12, 2024
4 4 court Document Thu 09/12 12:31 PM
Exhibit A- Copy of Death Certificate Related [+] (wdr) Modified on 9/12/2024 (Gilmore, Michael)
Related: [-] 3 Answer to Complaint filed by Emerald G Platzer. (wdr) filed by Defendant Emerald G Platzer
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/12 12:00 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Emerald G Platzer. (wdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 08/22 2:24 PM
Summons Issued to Karen E. Bezner for Service on Emerald G Platzer Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 10/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2024 (wdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/21 3:11 PM
Adversary case 24-01534 Complaint by Karen E. Bezner against Emerald G Platzer. Fee Amount $ 350.. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Bezner, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Att: 2 Exhibit