New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Referred: Sarah L Cave
Case #: 1:24-cv-06345
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Ruth Miller
Represented By
Richard Anthony Salvato
Peirce & Salvato PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Ruth Miller
Represented By
Richard Anthony Salvato
Peirce & Salvato PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Slab Builders, LLC
Represented By
Galina Stiler
Smith Mazure PC
contact info
Matthew Evan Markoff
Smith Mazure, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Studiolab, LLC
Represented By
Cesar O. Bilbao
The Law Office Of Eric D. Feldman
contact info
Anthony Daniel Capasso
Murphy Schiller & Wilkes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ruth Miller
Represented By
Richard Anthony Salvato
Peirce & Salvato PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Studiolab, LLC
Represented By
Cesar O. Bilbao
The Law Office Of Eric D. Feldman
contact info
Anthony Daniel Capasso
Murphy Schiller & Wilkes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Slab Builders, LLC
Represented By
Galina Stiler
Smith Mazure PC
contact info
Matthew Evan Markoff
Smith Mazure, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvaro Rolando Acosta Flores
Represented By
Paul Raymond Cordella
Ronai & Ronai, LLP
contact info
Holly Ostrov Ronai
Ronai & Ronai, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
UFO's Home Improvement Inc.
1563 Sound Avenue
Calverton, NY 11933
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Slab Builders, LLC
Represented By
Galina Stiler
Smith Mazure PC
contact info
Matthew Evan Markoff
Smith Mazure, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
66 66 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/07 3:33 PM
ORDER : As discussed at the telephonic status conference held today, April 7, 2025, the Court orders as follows: 1. The May 23, 2025 fact discovery deadline remains in place, and the parties shall proceed as follows: a. By Friday, April 11, 2025: i. Plaintiff shall provide Defendant Slab Builders, LLC ("Slab") updated authorizations to obtain medical records, and Slab shall re-serve its discovery responses on Plaintiff. ii. Defendant Ruth Miller shall respond to Plaintiff's written discovery requests. b. By Tuesday, April 22, 2025, Defendant Studiolab, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's written discovery requests. 2. A follow-up telephonic status conference is scheduled for Monday, May 5, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. on the Court's Microsoft Teams platform. The parties are directed to call: (646) 453-4442; access code: 802-400-292#, at the scheduled time. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 4/7/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 04/07 2:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave: Telephone Conference held on 4/7/2025. Attorney Paul Cordella appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Cesar Bilbao appeared on behalf of Defendant Studiolab, LLC. Attorney Richard Salvato appeared on behalf of Defendant Ruth Miller. Attorney Tushar Ahuja appeared on behalf of Defendant / Third-Party Plaintiff Slab Builders, LLC. Third-Party Defendant UFO's Home Improvement did not appear. (ne)
Related: [-]