Shawana Corcoran v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04583 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Shawana Corcoran
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 08/22 1:52 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 08/22/2024), Shawana Corcoran v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04583-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western District Court of Kentucky (wmil) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11949050.), filed by Shawana Corcoran. Service due by 11/20/2024 (wmil) |