California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:24-cv-05684
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
TSMC Arizona Corporation
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TSMC Technology, Inc.
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TSMC Washington, LLC
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TSMC North America
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elena Huizar
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Zepeda
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Winn
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Sterbinsky
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Lara Prieto
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marc Popisteanu
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James Joseph Perry
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward McKinley
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Langley
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Carrier
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lacey Bostick
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Modupe Adesemoye
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deborah Howington
Represented By
Daniel A. Kotchen
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
Lindsey Grunert
Kotchen And Low LLP
contact info
Daniel Lee Low
Kotchen & Low LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
TSMC North America Co. Ltd.
Terminated: 11/08/2024
Represented By
Fletcher C. Alford
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Kevin Liu
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Myles Alexander Lanzone
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
64 64 14 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/30 7:38 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 63 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
63 63 14 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/29 4:20 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protectiver Order filed by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd., TSMC Technology, Inc., TSMC Arizona Corporation, TSMC Washington, LLC.(Liu, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulated Protective Order (redline version)
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
62 62 3 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Wed 04/23 3:24 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting in part and denying in part 49 , 57 Parties' Motions to Seal. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]