Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:24-cv-01027
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 2:36 AM CST
Defendant
Huen Electric, Inc.
Represented By
Emily Ann Warwick
Fisher & Phillips Llp (nashville)
contact info
Defendant
Dan Pesavento
Represented By
Emily Ann Warwick
Fisher & Phillips Llp (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Van Mumford
Represented By
Karla M. Campbell
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/05 2:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice16 stating that he voluntary dismisses all claims against Defendants without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/5/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/04 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Van Mumford (Jennings, R.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/11 11:42 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Huen Electric, Inc. answer due 11/8/2024; Dan Pesavento answer due 11/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/11/2024) (ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/10 10:18 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint [unopposed] by Huen Electric, Inc., Dan Pesavento. (Warwick, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/24 12:14 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Huen Electric, Inc. and Dan Pesavento answer due 10/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/24/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 09/20 8:36 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Emily Ann Warwick admitted to this court . (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/19 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Huen Electric, Inc., Dan Pesavento. (Warwick, Emily)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Thu 09/19 2:22 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huen Electric, Inc.. (Warwick, Emily)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ann Warwick on behalf of Huen Electric, Inc., Dan Pesavento (Warwick, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Affidavit of Service Wed 09/11 5:01 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Van Mumford. Dan Pesavento served on 8/28/2024., AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Van Mumford. (Campbell, Karla)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/11 4:56 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Van Mumford. Huen Electric, Inc. served on 8/30/2024. (Campbell, Karla)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/23 10:18 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/23/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 08/22 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (am)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/22 4:17 PM
Summons issued as to Huen Electric, Inc., Dan Pesavento. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (am)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 08/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 08/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 08/22 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/22 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Huen Electric, Inc., Dan Pesavento (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4147534), filed by Van Mumford.(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 08/22 4:21 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Karla M. Campbell admitted to this court . (am)
Related: [-]