New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:24-cv-05897
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
Gerry Castro
Defendant
Aaron Felder
Defendant
Incorporated Village of Lawrence
Defendant
Steven C. Gottesman
Defendant
Samuel Nahmias
Defendant
Aaron M. Parnes
Defendant
Tammy M. Roz
Plaintiff
Moshe Glenn
Represented By
Sholom Wohlgelernter
Berg & David PLLC
contact info
Abraham David
Berg & David, PLLC
contact info
David Berg
Berg & David PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
The Saffron Culinary, Inc.
Represented By
Sholom Wohlgelernter
Berg & David PLLC
contact info
Abraham David
Berg & David, PLLC
contact info
David Berg
Berg & David PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MG Craft Kitchen, LLC
Represented By
Sholom Wohlgelernter
Berg & David PLLC
contact info
Abraham David
Berg & David, PLLC
contact info
David Berg
Berg & David PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 09/03 3:14 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, scheduled to commence at 9:30 a.m. on September 10, 2024, is CANCELED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/3/2024. (CV)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/03 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Moshe Glenn, MG Craft Kitchen, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc. (Berg, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Fri 08/30 3:15 PM
Letter notifying Court of settlement and voluntary dismissal of action by Moshe Glenn, MG Craft Kitchen, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc. (David, Abraham)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/30 11:18 AM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Ryan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Opposition
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 08/27 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Gerry Castro, Aaron Felder, Steven C. Gottesman, Incorporated Village of Lawrence, Samuel Nahmias, Aaron M. Parnes, Tammy M. Roz. (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Mon 08/26 6:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re8 Order to Show Cause,,,, Set Hearings,,, of Service of Order to Show Cause and Supporting Papers by Moshe Glenn, MG Craft Kitchen, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc. (Wohlgelernter, Sholom)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/26 1:41 PM
Proposed Summons. by Moshe Glenn, MG Craft Kitchen, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc. (Berg, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/26 1:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Let the defendants show cause by way of written submission why an order should not be issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Rule 65, and the authority of this Court as set forth herein. ORDERED that service by email and federal express of a copy of this Order, along with the papers upon which it is based shall be made upon Defendants via email to their counsel. ORDERED that answering papers, if any, shall be served on Plaintiffs' counsel, via ECF on or before August 30, 2024. ORDERED that reply papers, if any, shall be electronically filed and served on Defendants' counsel on or before September 3, 2024. ORDERED that a hearing will be held at 9:30AM before the undersigned on September 10, 2024; Show Cause Hearing set for 9/10/2024 at 9:30AM before Judge Joanna Seybert. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/26/2024. (CV)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 08/26 12:13 PM
Proposed summons7 was not issued for the following reasons: (1) The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint. (2) If multiple defendants, there must be a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. (3) The case number is incorrect/not listed. (4) The judges are incorrect/not listed. (5) Plaintiff's attorney section has not been completed. NOTE: The date on each summons is added by the Clerk's Office as of the date of issuance; please leave date blank. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Sun 08/25 8:51 PM
Proposed Summons. by Moshe Glenn, MG Craft Kitchen, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc. (Berg, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Sun 08/25 11:11 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Sun 08/25 11:07 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sun 08/25 11:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Sun 08/25 11:12 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons and/or a rider. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 08/23 1:33 PM
First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Moshe Glenn, MG CRAFT KITCHEN, LLC, The Saffron Culinary, Inc.. (David, Abraham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Moshe Glenn,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Naftali Solomon,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Declaration of Abraham David,
Att: 14 Exhibit 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit 12,
Att: 16 Memorandum in Support
Thursday, August 22, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sholom Wohlgelernter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Wohlgelernter, Sholom)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/22 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham David on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (David, Abraham)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/22 5:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18206171 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by The Saffron Culinary, Inc., MG CRAFT KITCHEN, LLC, Moshe Glenn. (Berg, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons