Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Karen Gren Scholer
Case #: 3:24-cv-02156
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 18, 2025 2:53 AM CST
Defendant
Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc
Represented By
Jesse A Cripps
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Emily Claire Piepenburg
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Douglas Fuchs
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Matthew T Sessions
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Warden
Represented By
Melissa Ann Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info
Curt Christopher Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
26 26 11 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 12/04 1:35 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (ECF No.16 ). Plaintiffs collective action claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs remaining claims against Defendant herein are stayed. See 9U.S.C. §3. It is therefore ORDERED that this case is administratively closed pending resolution of the arbitration. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 12/4/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 12/04 1:36 PM
Civil Case Terminated per26 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
25 25 respm Reply Fri 11/01 5:15 PM
REPLY filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc re:16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Fri 10/18 4:31 PM
RESPONSE filed by Brian Warden re:16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/10 4:38 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that22 Plaintiff Brian Warden's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED . Plaintiff shall respond to16 Defendant Pilot Catastrophe Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings on or before October 18, 2024 . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 10/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/09 4:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Brian Warden (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
21 21 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 11:09 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Sessions. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 11:08 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas Fuchs. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/23 11:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse A. Cripps, Jr. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 9/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
18 18 respm Appendix in Support Wed 09/18 8:05 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Wed 09/18 7:52 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc re16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Compel Stay Wed 09/18 7:51 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration (), MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 7:24 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Matthew T. Sessions (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14929203) filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 7:20 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Douglas M. Fuchs (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14929200) filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/18 7:16 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jesse A. Cripps (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14929197) filed by Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 09/18 7:08 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Claire Piepenburg on behalf of Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Piepenburg, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
11 11 misc Jury Demand Wed 09/11 5:07 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brian Warden. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Fri 08/30 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc ; served on 8/28/2024. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
9 9 order Electronic Standing Order - Specific Requirements for Judge Scholer Fri 08/23 8:15 AM
ELECTRONIC STANDING ORDER: Counsel are required to review and comply with the Court's Judge Specific Requirements, which can be found here:[LINK:Judge Requirements] . The Court updates its Requirements periodically. Also, counsel are required to review and comply with the Northern District of Texas's Local Civil Rules, which can be found here:[LINK:Civil Rules] . In particular, the Court directs counsel to review Rules 3.1, 7.4, and 81.2, regarding certificates of interested persons, and Rule 83.10, regarding local counsel. Counsel are expected to review the Requirements and Local Rules before contacting the Court with questions. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/23/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 08/23 8:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Pilot Catastrophe Services Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 qcref Scholer Fri 08/23 8:14 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 08/22 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Ann Moore on behalf of Brian Warden. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 08/22 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curt Christopher Hesse on behalf of Brian Warden. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 08/22 4:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brian Warden. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Affidavit Thu 08/22 4:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Brian Warden. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 08/22 4:32 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Brian Warden. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/22 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Pilot Catastrophe Services, Inc. filed by Brian Warden. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14861795) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet