Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-16757

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:24-bk-16758
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
9531 Beverly Rd
Pico Rivera, CA 90660-2134
Represented By
Leonard M Shulman
Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 claims Withdrawal of Claim Tue 04/01 4:06 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 10 Filed by Creditor California Dept of Tax and Fee Administration. (Riddle, Liz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 03/20 2:11 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 04/22/2025 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1368Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV)
Related: [-] 238
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
29 29 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 12/04 2:06 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Malcolm, William. (Malcolm, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
28 28 misc Supplemental Tue 10/01 3:12 PM
Supplemental (REFILED to correct docket no. 26; filing fee paid on 9/26/24) Supplemental Verification of Master Mailing List, Summary of Amendments, Amended Schedules G and H, Amended Statement of Financial Affairs (with Proof of Service) Filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Shulman, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
27 27 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 09/27 8:20 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. Document is missing Local Bankruptcy Rule Form 1007-1.1AMENDED.SUMMARY. Also no new creditors listed on matrix THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (SM2)
Related: [-] 26 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Thursday, September 26, 2024
26 26 misc Amended List of Creditors (Fee) Thu 09/26 4:36 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Supplemental Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. (Shulman, Leonard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 09/26 4:47 PM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-16758-VZ] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57422667. Fee amount 34.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#26
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
25 25 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Tue 09/17 9:52 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Arias, Jonathan. (Arias, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 09/15 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)
Friday, September 13, 2024
23 23 misc Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) Fri 09/13 3:42 PM
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) Related [+] (SM2)
Related: [-] 22 Corp Resolution Auth Filing filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1), Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum), Schedule A/B: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B), Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D), Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F), Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G), Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H), Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202), Statement of Financial Affairs (Official Form 107 or 207) (Official Form 107 or 207), Disclosure of Compensation of Atty for Debtor (Official Form 2030)
22 22 59 pgs misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Fri 09/13 2:31 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Shulman, Leonard)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thursday, September 05, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 09/05 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
20 20 notice Notice Wed 09/04 10:37 AM
Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents Filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Casal, Max)
Related: [-] 19 Order Granting Motion to approve joint administration of cases; ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; jointly administrated with Lead case 2:24-bk-16757-VZ and Member cases - 2:24-bk-16758-VZ; 2:24-bk-16759-VZ; 2:24-bk-16760-VZ; 2:24-bk-16061-VZ; 2:24-bk-16062-VZ "for additional information refer to image" (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc11 ) Signed on 9/3/2024. (TJ).
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
19 19 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Tue 09/03 3:33 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:24-bk-16757 with Member Case 2:24-bk-16758 Related [+] Signed on 9/3/2024. (TJ)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 08/28 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
17 17 notice Notice Wed 08/28 7:15 PM
Notice Notice Of Continued Perfection; Demand For Adequate Protection; And Demand Of Sequestration Of Any Cash Collateral Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 362(b)(3), 363(c)(4), 363(e), 546(b), and 552(b) Filed by Creditor Producers Livestock Marketing Association. (Gomez, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Request for special notice Wed 08/28 6:22 PM
Request for special notice Request For Special Notice And Courtesy Notices Of Electronic Filings Filed by Creditor Producers Livestock Marketing Association. (Gomez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
15 15 misc Request for special notice Mon 08/26 12:24 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Linkun Investment, Inc.. (Zunshine, Phillip)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Request for special notice Mon 08/26 12:22 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Linkun Investment, Inc.. (Kessler, Alexander)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Request for special notice Mon 08/26 12:21 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Linkun Investment, Inc.. (Grant, Miles)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 08/26 12:14 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. CORRECTION: Main case number not included on caption page of PDF. CORRECTION: Incorrect caption page on PDF. Case not Jointly Administered - THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO WITHDRAW AND RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
11 11 20 pgs motion Joint Administration (motion) Mon 08/26 10:58 AM
Motion for Joint Administration [Debtors' Motion for Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Leonard M. Shulman in Support Thereof] Filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Shulman, Leonard)
Related: [-]
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 08/26 8:09 AM
Order: (1) Setting Conference on Status of Reorganization Case; (2) Requiring Debtors-In-Possession to Appear at Status Conference And File Report on Status of Reorganization Case, or Face Possible (A) Conversion of Case to Chapter 7; (B) Dismissal of Case; or (C) Appointment of Trustee; (3) Requiring Compliance With Standards Re Employment And Fee Applications; (4) Giving Notice of Probable Use of Court-Appointed Expert Witness For Contested Valuation Requests; (5) Mandating Use of Forms For Disclosure Statement And Plan; And (6) Establishing Procedure For (A) Motion For Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement; And (B) Motion For Order Confirming Plan (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 8/26/2024 (SC2)
Related: [-] 1
court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Mon 08/26 9:26 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (TJ)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, August 25, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of reassignment of case (BNC)
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 08/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Friday, August 23, 2024
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Fri 08/23 3:08 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/20/2024 at 09:00 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/19/2024. (LL2)
Related: [-]
4 4 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 08/23 2:58 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Gomez, Michael. (Gomez, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 08/23 12:42 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Warrington, Gerrick. (Warrington, Gerrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Notice of reassignment of case (BNC) Fri 08/23 9:31 AM
Notice of reassignment of case due to related cases filed concurrently: 2:24-bk-16757-VZ Manning Land Company, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; 2:24-bk-16759-VZ ADD Enterprises, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; 2:24-bk-16760-VZ Charlie DiMaria & Son Inc., a California Corporation; 2:24-bk-16761-VZ RNCK, Inc., a New York Corporation; and 2:24-bk-16762-VZ Salvatore Anthony DiMaria . (BNC) (LL2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 08/22 3:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Manning's Beef, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company List of Equity Security Holders due 09/5/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/5/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/5/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/5/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/5/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/5/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/5/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 09/5/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/5/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 09/5/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 09/5/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/5/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/5/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 09/5/2024. (Shulman, Leonard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 08/22 4:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-16758] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A57277144. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Thu 08/22 10:11 PM
Judge Vincent P. Zurzolo added to case due to related cases filed concurrently: 2:24-bk-16757-VZ Manning Land Company, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; 2:24-bk-16759-VZ ADD Enterprises, Inc., a Delaware Corporation; 2:24-bk-16760-VZ Charlie DiMaria & Son Inc., a California Corporation; 2:24-bk-16761-VZ RNCK, Inc., a New York Corporation; and 2:24-bk-16762-VZ Salvatore Anthony DiMaria . Involvement of Judge Barry Russell Terminated (LL2)
Related: [-]