Montana District Court
Judge:Dana L Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-00087
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 17, 2025 1:20 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Alibi Bail Bonds, LLC
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jay Hubber
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info
Counter Defendant
Vince Harris
Represented By
Adam C. Cook
Everett Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alibi Bail Bonds, LLC
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Crum and Forster Indemnity Company
Represented By
Kelsie Lorraine Nolan
Crowley Fleck
contact info
Matthew A. Baldassin
Crowley Fleck Pllp - Missoula
contact info
Defendant
Jay Hubber
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Jaeger
Defendant
John Does 1-5
Defendant
City and County of Butte Silver Bow
Represented By
Shelby K. Towe
Boone Karlberg P.C.
contact info
Cynthia L. Walker
Boone Karlberg P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vince Harris
Represented By
Adam C. Cook
Everett Law, PLLC
contact info
Third Party Defendant
City and County of Butte Silver Bow
Represented By
Shelby K. Towe
Boone Karlberg P.C.
contact info
Cynthia L. Walker
Boone Karlberg P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Alibi Bail Bonds, LLC
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Jay Hubber
Represented By
Palmer A. Hoovestal
Hoovestal Law Firm
contact info

GPO Feb 20 2025
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Harris Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger" (Doc. 24) is GRANTED; and The Clerk is directed to enter Defendant Nicholas Jaegers default. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 2/20/2025. (KAH)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 misc Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT Tue 03/18 2:15 PM
Clerk's Notice of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and objection having been made to the jurisdiction of an U.S. Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Dana L. Christensen. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
36 36 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 03/13 2:16 PM
Related: [-]
35 35 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 03/13 12:42 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
34 34 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Tue 03/04 9:53 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
33 33 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Mon 03/03 8:52 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/17/2025. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
32 32 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 02/20 4:01 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nicholas Jaeger. (KAH)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 02/20 3:27 PM
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Harris Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger" (Doc. 24) is GRANTED; and The Clerk is directed to enter Defendant Nicholas Jaegers default. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 2/20/2025. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/05 12:07 PM
Terminate Deadlines as to24 Reply; email forwarded to chambers. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/04 9:45 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger filed by Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
29 29 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/21 10:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger filed by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company. (Nolan, Kelsie)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/21 9:40 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger filed by City and County of Butte Silver Bow. (Walker, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/21 1:36 PM
Terminate Deadlines as to Response ddl24 . (ACC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
27 27 minutes Telephonic Status Conference Wed 01/08 2:07 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: The Court held a status conference on 1/8/2025 to determine whether Plaintiff had served Defendant Nicholas Jaeger with a Summons and the Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. (Law Clerk: E. Joyce), (SLL)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/08 11:25 AM
NOTICE by Vince Harris (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Service
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
25 25 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Tue 01/07 2:35 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re24 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger filed by Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Service
24 24 motion Entry of Default Tue 01/07 2:26 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant Nicholas Jaeger . Adam C. Cook appearing for Plaintiff Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Order/Judgment - MT Mon 01/06 11:23 AM
ORDER granting21 ADOPTING THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND RELEASING CONFIDENTIAL CRIMINAL JUSTICE INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/6/2025. (TLO)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
22 22 order Order Setting - MT Fri 01/03 3:43 PM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The call-in number is as follows: 833-990-9400; Meeting ID:882927420. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/3/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Order/Judgment - MT Fri 01/03 12:04 PM
MOTION for Order/Judgment for the Release of Confidential Criminal Justice Information . Adam C. Cook appearing for Plaintiff Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam) Modified on 1/3/2025 to clean up text (ACC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Mon 12/23 3:58 PM
City and County of Butte-Silver Bow's ANSWER to14 Third Party Complaint by Butte Silver-Bow County. (Walker, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 12/17 12:07 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/17/2024. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Thu 12/05 11:01 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption . Adam C. Cook appearing for Plaintiff Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Revised Case Caption,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Amend Case Caption
17 17 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Thu 12/05 10:36 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Vince Harris. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 10:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Butte Silver-Bow County. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (TLO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
15 15 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Tue 11/26 1:29 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Butte Silver-Bow County, re14 Third Party Complaint (Hoovestal, Palmer)
Related: [-]
14 14 23 pgs cmp Third Party Complaint Tue 11/26 1:24 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Butte Silver-Bow County, filed by Jay Hubber. (Hoovestal, Palmer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
13 13 utility Notice of Correction - MT Tue 10/22 8:34 AM
Notice of Correction: re12 Notice (Other). The filing error relates to: Incorrect Docket Event used. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/21 5:22 PM
NOTICE by Butte Silver-Bow County re8 Amended Complaint Def BSB's Answer to First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Walker, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 09/18 4:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Butte Silver-Bow County. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (ACC)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Wed 09/18 4:08 PM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Butte Silver-Bow County, re8 Amended Complaint (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 09/17 3:38 PM
ANSWER (State Court) to7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Vince Harris(as personal representative of the Estate of William Harris III). (ACC)
Related: [-]
8 8 15 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/17 3:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Vince Harris. (ACC)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim Tue 09/17 3:35 PM
ANSWER (State Court) to6 Complaint with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Butte Silver-Bow County, CROSSCLAIM against Nicholas Jaeger, COUNTERCLAIM against Vince Harris by Jay Hubber, Alibi Bail Bonds, LLC. (ACC)
Related: [-]
6 6 10 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 09/17 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT (State Court) and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Vince Harris. (ACC)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 09/17 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED (from Montana Second Judicial District Court, Silver Bow County, case number DV-23-329.) (ACC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Docket,
Att: 2 Notice of Removal
utility Remark Tue 09/17 3:40 PM
Remark: Original State Court documents received electronically; no paper documents available. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - MT Fri 09/13 12:55 PM
Disclosure Statement by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company. (Baldassin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/12 9:26 AM
NOTICE by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company (Baldassin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/11 5:27 PM
Crum and Foster's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company. (Baldassin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - SDM Thu 08/22 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company from Montana Second Judicial District Court Silver Bow County, case number DV-23-329, filed by Crum and Forster Indemnity Company. (TLO) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2024) (MMS). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2024) (MMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - State Court Docket
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 08/22 11:04 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3315178 (TLO)
Related: [-]