Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00133
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Scott D. Nelson (1)
Represented By
Thomas M. Petersen
Petersen Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Danielle Fliam
Assistant United States Attorney - Lincoln
contact info

GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)[8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
GPO Aug 14 2024
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)[8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
GPO Aug 22 2024
WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT AND ORDER as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's waiver is hereby accepted, and Defendant's not guilty plea to all counts is entered on record with the Clerk of Court. Progression Order to be issued by further order of the court. The Arraignment set for 8/23/2024 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO Sep 09 2024
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 27), is granted as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by November 12, 2024. The time between today's date and November 12, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
GPO Nov 04 2024
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 39), is granted as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by January 13, 2025. The time between today's date and January 13, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 41), is granted as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by February 13, 2025. The time between today's date and February 13, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Extend as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by March 13, 2025. The time between today's date and March 13, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
GPO Mar 11 2025
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Deadline for Filing Pretrial Motions, (Filing No. 45), is granted as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by April 14, 2025. The time between today's date and April 14, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)
GPO Mar 18 2025
ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a) as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (TCL)
GPO Apr 11 2025
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Motions Deadline, (Filing No. 53), is granted as to Scott D. Nelson (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by May 15, 2025. The time between today's date and May 15, 2025, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES)

Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 3:45 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 7/31/2024 and unsealed on 8/9/2024 pursuant to memorandum as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
4 4 AMENDED CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
6 6 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Initial Appearance set for 8/12/2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE (MEMORANDUM) TO UNSEAL MAGISTRATE JUDGE CASE by Attorney Danielle Fliam as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Attorney Thomas M. Petersen as to defendant(s) Scott D. Nelson. (Petersen, Thomas) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 8/12/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint held. Oral order issued to counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Government's unopposed oral motion to continue detention hearing is granted. Detention Hearing set for 8/14/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Government's oral motion for detention is pending as to flight and danger. A preliminary hearing will be scheduled if requested following the detention hearing on 8/14/2024. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal to be detained pending further order of the court. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Sean P. Lynch for Danielle Fliam, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Thomas M. Petersen, Retained; Appearance for Pretrial Services: Maxwell Tamm; Courtroom Deputy: Sara Pankoke; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 1:45 PM; Time Stop: 1:53 PM; Time in Court: 8 Minutes. (SLP) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
11 11 TEXT ORAL MOTION - for detention by Attorney Sean P. Lynch on behalf of Danielle Fliam as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. (SLP) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
12 12 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JES) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
14 14 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Scott D. Nelson. Court Date & Time [ 8/12/2024 1:45:43 PM ]. File Size [ 1961 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:10 ]. (Initial Appearance). (auto-docket). [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
15 15 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 8/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Detention hearing held. Oral argument and proffer. Government's oral motion for detention is granted as to flight and danger. Order of Detention to be issued. Defendant waives his right to a preliminary hearing on the complaint. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal to be detained pending further order of the court. Hearing held in Omaha, NE; Appearance for Plaintiff: Danielle Fliam, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Thomas M. Petersen, Retained; Appearance for Pretrial Services: Julie Gust for Maxwell Tamm; Courtroom Deputy: Sara Pankoke; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder; No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 1:56 PM; Time Stop: 2:14 PM; Time in Court: 18 Minutes. (SLP) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP) [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
17 17 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Scott D. Nelson. Court Date & Time [ 8/14/2024 1:56:54 PM ]. File Size [ 4063 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:56 ]. (Detention Hearing). (auto-docket). [8:24-mj-00313-MDN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
18 18 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. (MLR)
Related: [-]
19 19 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment18 as to defendant(s) Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MLR)
Related: [-]
20 20 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Scott D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MLR)
Related: [-]