Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00939
Case Filed:Aug 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 3:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Joe Bryan Templin (1)
Represented By
Christina Arellano-Villarreal
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
David Almaraz
Law Office Of David Almaraz
contact info
Material Witness
Mayco Gomez-Moreno
Represented By
Luis Antonio Figueroa
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Dora Perez-Garcia
Represented By
Luis Antonio Figueroa
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Leslie Ann Cortez
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 5:13 AM CDT
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Joe Bryan Templin (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 8/1/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Mayco Gomez-Moreno, Dora Perez-Garcia as to Joe Bryan Templin. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 8/1/2024 at 09:33 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on July 30, 2024 at 04:36 PM as to Joe Bryan Templin. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Joe Bryan Templin. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Joe Bryan Templin added. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Joe Bryan Templin held on 8/1/2024. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination Hearing to the Court, however Defendant would like to proceed with a Detention Hearing. Appearances: Melissa Andrea Lopez AUSA; FPD Ramon Villafranca Jr. (on duty); USPTO: Ana Rodriguez; USM: Deputy Bobby Molina. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:46 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Suzanne Buckley, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS Mayco Gomez-Moreno as to Joe Bryan Templin (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 8/1/2024. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is temporarily detained in case pending Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Financial Affidavit executed. Material Witness requests appointed counsel. Private Attorney appointed. Next on list: Luis Figueroa. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. Material Witness requested a letter to be sent to consulate of Mexico. All parties appeared in person. Material witness sworn in. Material Witness submitted written waiver of Detention Hearing to the Court. Appearances: Melissa Andrea Lopez, AUSA; Luis Figueroa f/Material Witness. (Tape #10:01 AM - 10:07 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia ) (DUSM: Deputy Bobby Molina) (Interpreter: Suzanne Buckley/used) (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS Dora Perez-Garcia as to Joe Bryan Templin (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 8/1/2024. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is temporarily detained in case pending Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. Financial Affidavit executed. Material Witness requests appointed counsel. Private Attorney appointed. Next on list: Luis Figueroa. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. Material Witness requested a letter to be sent to consulate of Guatemala. All parties appeared in person. Material witness sworn in. Material Witness wish to proceed with Detention Hearing. The Court advised, should attorney file Waiver, Hearing will be cancelled. Appearances: Melissa Andrea Lopez, AUSA; Luis Figueroa f/Material Witness. (Tape #10:01 AM - 10:07 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia ) (DUSM: Deputy Bobby Molina) (Interpreter: Suzanne Buckley/used) (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
5 5 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. Agent: Adrian Davila (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER on Material Witness Affidavit. The material witness(es) are committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal's Service pending a detention hearing. Agent: Adrian Davila (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (ElliotGallegos, 5). [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Joe Bryan Templin. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Joe Bryan Templin. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Joe Bryan Templin. Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
12 12 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Mayco Gomez-Moreno as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (tat5). (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/1/2024) (tat5). [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Mayco Gomez-Moreno. Luis Figueroa appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
14 14 Letter sent to Consulate General of Mexico re Mayco Gomez-Moreno, Material Witness in case as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Mayco Gomez-Moreno to the custody of the United States Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
16 16 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Dora Perez-Garcia as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (tat5). (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/1/2024) (tat5). [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Dora Perez-Garcia. Luis Figueroa appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
18 18 Letter sent to Consulate General of Guatemala re Dora Perez-Garcia, Material Witness in case as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS Dora Perez-Garcia to the custody of the United States Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 8/8/2024 at 10:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
20 20 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (dlg5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
21 21 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Dora Perez-Garcia in the case of Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (Figueroa, Luis) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Material Witness Mayco Gomez-Moreno in the case of Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (ElliotGallegos, 5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christina Arellano-Villarreal, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (Arellano-Villarreal, Christina) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Mayco Gomez-Moreno to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Dora Perez-Garcia to the custody of the United States Marshal. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
25 25 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Joe Bryan Templin. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (jb5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos: DETENTION HEARING as to Joe Bryan Templin held on 8/8/2024. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. The Court addressed and granted, Defendant's Motion to Substitute Attorney David Almaraz in place of AFPD, Chrsitina Arellano-Villarreal. Attorney David Almaraz is now attorney of record. Government is still seeking detention for Defendant. Defense counsel requests reasonable bond for Defendant for reasons stated on the record. The Court will take the matter under advisement and will issue Order accordingly. [Time in Court: 10:04 AM - 10:13 AM] Appearances:AUSA: Melissa Lopez f/ Government; USPO: Monica Trevino f/ Probation; Atty: David Almaraz f/ Defendant.(ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease (Not Utilized)) Deft remanded to Custody, filed. (mlr5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
26 26 MOTION to Substitute Attorney David Almaraz by Joe Bryan Templin, filed. (mep5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 ORDER granting26 Motion to Substitute Attorney David Almaraz for Joe Bryan Templin replacing Christina Arellano-Villarreal and Federal Public Defender - Laredo as to Joe Bryan Templin (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos.) Parties notified. (mep5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
28 28 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Joe Bryan Templin ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mep5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
29 29 Sealed Event, filed. (With attachments) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER denying29 Sealed Motion as to Joe Bryan Templin (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (tat5) [5:24-mj-00956]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
31 31 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Joe Bryan Templin (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, filed. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment