Alaska District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00083
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 11:20 PM AKDT
Defendant
Elizabeth Chardome (2)
Defendant
Kyle Reynolds (1)
Represented By
Bradly A. Carlson
Carlson Law Group, LLC
contact info
Jamie McGrady
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christina M. Sherman
U.S. Attorney'S Office (anch)
contact info
Adam Alexander
U.S. Attorney'S Office (anch)
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 12:55 AM AKDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
Notice of Defendant in State Custody re Kyle Reynolds. Defendant is being held at Goose Creek Correctional Complex. (BJK, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kyle Reynolds (1). (BJK, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Reynolds
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Kyle Reynolds. cc: emailed USMS (BJK, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Kyle Reynolds.(Alexander, Adam) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Writ,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jamie McGrady appearing for Kyle Reynolds (McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
4 4 KFR TEXT ORDER GRANTING Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum2 as to Kyle Reynolds. It being necessary for the defendant in this matter to appear before this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the government's motion for a writ of habeas corpus ad prosequendum is GRANTED. The Clerk of this Court is directed to enter the attached writ. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
5 5 KFR TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing as to Kyle Reynolds: Initial Appearance on Complaint/Detention Hearing set for 4/25/2024 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Kyle F. Reardon. (BJK, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
6 6 NOTICE of Intent to Seek Detention by USA as to Kyle Reynolds (Alexander, Adam) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
7 7 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT (Sealed) as to Kyle Reynolds. (Schmidt, Benjamin) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/25/24 in case as to Kyle Reynolds. (PXS, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kyle F. Reardon: Initial Appearance on Complaint/Detention Hearing as to Kyle Reynolds held 1:41 p.m. to 1:52 p.m. on 4/25/2024 and recorded in Anchorage Courtroom 6. Copy of complaint1 given to defendant; summarized. Defendant advised of general rights and penalties. Jamie McGrady FPD appointed. FPD notified. Waiver of a Preliminary Hearing FILED. Under Criminal Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and related cases. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. This order incorporates the provisions of MGO 21-11 and a written order is attached. Court ordered defendant's detention. Status Conference set for 5/23/2024 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Kyle F. Reardon. APPEARANCES: Defendant present, In-Custody; Adam Alexander, AUSA; Jamie McGrady, FPD; Benjamin Schmidt, USPO. (IAH, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kyle Reynolds (IAH, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kyle Reynolds (IAH, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kyle Reynolds Signed by Judge Kyle F. Reardon on 4/25/2024. (IAH, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by USA as to Kyle Reynolds.(Alexander, Adam) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christina M. Sherman appearing for USA. (Sherman, Christina) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
15 15 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Protective Order13 as to Kyle Reynolds. Signed by Judge Kyle F. Reardon on 5/3/2024. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion at 16 UNOPPOSED by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
18 18 KFR TEXT ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion for Expedited Consideration as to Kyle Reynolds. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
19 19 KFR TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: After due consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion to continue status hearing16 , the motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the status hearing set for May 23, 2024, is VACATED and RESET to June 24, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. The Court finds excludable delay from May 23, 2024, to June 24, 2024 under 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A), the ends of justice will be served by granting this continuance and outweigh the best interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial; (h)(7)(B)(i) failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice; (h)(7)(B)(iv) continuance granted in order to obtain counsel, substitute counsel, or give reasonable time to prepare. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
20 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Status Hearing by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
21 21 KFR TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: After due consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion to continue status hearing20 , the motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the status hearing set for June 24, 2024, is VACATED and RESET to July 31, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Judge Kyle F. Reardon. The Court finds excludable delay from May 23, 2024, to *July 31, 2024 under 18 U.S.C. § 3161 (h)(7)(A), the ends of justice will be served by granting this continuance and outweigh the best interest of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial; (h)(7)(B)(i) failure to continue would stop further proceedings or result in miscarriage of justice; (h)(7)(B)(iv) continuance granted in order to obtain counsel, substitute counsel, or give reasonable time to prepare. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 6/13/2024 *to correct date to 7/31/24 and regenerate nef. (BJK, COURT STAFF). [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
22 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
23 23 KFR TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing as to Kyle Reynolds re Unopposed Motion to Continue Status Conference22 : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2024 at 1:30 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Judge Kyle F. Reardon. The hearing is set in order to more fully develop the factual record in support of the parties' third unopposed motion to continue. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
24 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Vacate Hearing 23 by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion at 24 (UNOPPOSED) by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 19, 2024
26 26 KFR TEXT ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Expedited Consideration as to Kyle Reynolds. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
27 27 KFR TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: After due consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion to vacate the July 19 hearing24 , the motion is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the motion hearing set for July 19, 2024, is VACATED. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
28 28 KFR TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: The Motion at22 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Vacate Hearing 23 is DENIED as Moot in light of order at 27 Vacating hearing. (BJK, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
29 29 KFR TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: The time for the Status Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 1:30 PM is ADVANCED to begin at 11:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 5 before Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
30 30 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Waive Defendant's Presence at Status Hearing by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
31 31 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion at Doc. 30 UNOPPOSED by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 KFR TEXT ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Expedited Consideration as to Kyle Reynolds. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
33 33 MMS TEXT ORDER as to Kyle Reynolds: After due consideration of the defendant's unopposed motion to waive his presence at the July 31, 2024, status hearing30 , the motion is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Mr. Reynolds waives his presence at the July 31, 2024 status conference and shall not be transported to attend the hearing. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
34 34 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble: Status Conference as to Kyle Reynolds held 11:03 AM to 11:06 AM on 7/31/2024 and recorded in Anchorage Courtroom 5. Court and counsel heard re defendant's waived appearance, defendant's status of counsel in state case and defendant's oral motion for status conference and or arraignment GRANTED . Status Conference/Arraignment set for 8/23/2024 at 1:30 pm in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Kyle F. Reardon. APPEARANCES: Defendant not present, in custody (waived); Adam Alexander, AUSA; Christina M. Sherman, AUSA; Jamie McGrady, FPD; IAH, CRD. (ASH, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
35 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Appoint Substitute Counsel by Jamie McGrady. by Kyle Reynolds.(McGrady, Jamie) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 19, 2024
36 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jamie McGrady withdrawn from case as to Kyle Reynolds. Signed by Judge Kyle F. Reardon on 8/16/2024. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF) cc: CJA Administrator [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
37 37 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradly A. Carlson appearing for Kyle Reynolds (Carlson, Bradly) [3:24-mj-00180-KFR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
38 38 INDICTMENT COVER SHEETS AND SIGNATURES as to Kyle Reynolds (1) count(s) 1, 3, Elizabeth Chardome (2) count 2. (CME, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Reynolds,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet re Defendant Chardome
39 39 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Kyle Reynolds and Elizabeth Chardome. (CME, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
40 40 MMS TEXT ORDER as to Elizabeth Chardome re39 Indictment Arraignment/Detention set for 9/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 6 before Matthew McCrary Scoble. (CME, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]