Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01856
Case Filed:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 2:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (1)
Represented By
Michael F. Gorman
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 4:50 AM CDT
Friday, July 26, 2024
Arrest of Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera. (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera. (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera held on 7/29/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (L. Quevedo) as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera, ( Detention Hearing set for 8/1/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,, Preliminary Hearing set for 8/1/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael F. Gorman appearing for Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera . Attorney Michael F. Gorman added to party Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera(pty:dft) (Gorman, Michael) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (Gorman, Michael) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Detained Without Bond as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:24-mj-03226-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot2)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Luis Antonio Dominguez Talavera (bot2)
Related: [-]