Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-03159
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 3:13 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam R. Hines
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Adrian Armando Amador (1)
Terminated: 08/21/2024
Represented By
Ray Velarde
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 5:45 AM CDT
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
Arrest of Adrian Armando Amador (ll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Adrian Armando Amador by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Adrian Armando Amador. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Adrian Armando Amador. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING Ray Velarde as Counsel. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Initial Appearance in Person as to Adrian Armando Amador held on 7/24/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Adrian Armando Amador (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING IN PERSON as to Adrian Armando Amador, (Detention Hearing set for 7/29/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Anne T. Berton, Preliminary Hearing set for 7/29/2024 09:00 AM in El Paso before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Adrian Armando Amador. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Adrian Armando Amador (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (ll)
Related: [-]