Texas Western District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00135
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 3:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Khalid Carroll McMaryion (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-Midland/Odessa
Federal Public Defender
contact info
John J. Velasquez
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mark Tindall
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Joseph Anthony Mahoney
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 5:46 AM CDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (1). (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion for INSTANTER (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
Arrest of Khalid Carroll McMaryion (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Initial Appearance as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion held on 7/2/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR - Midland.) (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Duty Pub. Defender-Midland/Odessa for Khalid Carroll McMaryion. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 7/15/2024 09:00 AM in Midland before Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John J. Velasquez appearing for Khalid Carroll McMaryion . Attorney John J. Velasquez added to party Khalid Carroll McMaryion(pty:dft) (Velasquez, John) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
11 11 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion on 7/2/2024. (jb3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald C. Griffin:Preliminary Hearing/Detention Hearing as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion held on 7/15/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR Midland.) (slt) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
13 13 EXHIBIT LIST as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion.(slt) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Report
14 14 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to NO BOND as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (1). Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (je3) [7:24-mj-00183-RCG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Midland/Odessa Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (jb3)
Related: [-]
15 15 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (1) count(s) 1. (jb3)
Related: [-] dacted Version
17 17 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Khalid Carroll McMaryion (jb3)
Related: [-]