Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-15278

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-ap-01539
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marvin Daniels
101 Winthrop Rd.
Edison, NJ 08817
Represented By
Marvin Daniels
contact info
Plaintiff
Vishwadat Matapersad
Represented By
Kenneth W Thomas
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaline Itwaru
Represented By
Kenneth W Thomas
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, December 26, 2024
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 3:22 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Morris Bauer Duane Morris, LLP 1037 Raymond Blvd Newark, NJ 07102-5423 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 12 Joint Scheduling Order
court Notice of Returned Mail Fri 01/03 3:23 PM
Returned Mail Notice. The court has received notification that the US Postal Service has determined that the following parties have an address that is undeliverable: Notice Recipient's Address on Envelope Returned to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center: Morris Bauer Duane Morris, LLP 1037 Raymond Blvd Newark, NJ 07102-5423 , Related [+] (JDM)
Related: [-] 11 Mediation Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/13 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 12/13 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 12/11 8:45 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Alias Summons Issued Related [+] (dmi)
Related: [-] 8 Alias Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 12/9/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.
court Hearing Held Wed 12/11 8:45 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT MEDIATION ORDER ENTERED Related [+] (dmi)
Related: [-] 9 Amended Alias Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 12/12/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 order Joint Scheduling Order Tue 12/10 9:35 AM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024. Discovery due by 4/9/2025. Trial date set for 8/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (dmi)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Mediation Order Tue 12/10 9:33 AM
Mediation Order. Morris Bauer added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024. (dmi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 11:12 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Karina Pia Lucid on behalf of Marvin Daniels. (Lucid, Karina)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Held Tue 11/19 4:33 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Alias Summons Issued Related [+] (dmi)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for Service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 court Alias Summons Issued Tue 11/12 12:24 PM
Amended Alias Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 12/12/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (llb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 court Alias Summons Issued Fri 11/08 4:08 PM
Alias Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 12/9/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 12/10/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (mmf)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request for Alias Summons Fri 11/08 4:02 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by Kenneth W Thomas on behalf of Shaline Itwaru, Vishwadat Matapersad. (mmf) REQUEST DOES NOT CONTAIN ORIGINAL SIGNATURE OF ATTORNEY. Modified on 11/8/2024 (mmf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Vishwadat Matapersad, Plaintiff Shaline Itwaru
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 utility Judge Correspondence Fri 11/01 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Related [+]. (km)
Related: [-] 4 Request to Enter Default filed by Plaintiff Vishwadat Matapersad, Plaintiff Shaline Itwaru
Thursday, October 31, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Fri 11/01 9:11 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Kenneth W Thomas on behalf of Shaline Itwaru, Vishwadat Matapersad. (dmi)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-01539 Complaint by Vishwadat Matapersad, Shaline Itwaru against Marvin Daniels. Receipt Number 60000564, Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (mmf) Modified TEXT on 8/23/2024 (mmf). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2024 (llb). filed by Plaintiff Vishwadat Matapersad, Plaintiff Shaline Itwaru,2 Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for Service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (mmf)
4 4 misc Request to Enter Default Thu 10/31 2:59 PM
Request to Enter Default Against Marvin Daniels filed by Kenneth W Thomas on behalf of Shaline Itwaru, Vishwadat Matapersad. (gan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Entry of Default
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 24, 2024
court Notice of Docketing Error Thu 10/24 9:28 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing Related [+]. Type of Error: FILED IN THE INCORRECT CASE, filed by Court. Please disregard. (mrg)
Related: [-] 3 Document
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
3 3 court Document Tue 10/22 12:37 PM
Request for Trustee's Report of No Assets. (mmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from CMG to MEH Fri 10/18 8:57 AM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective October 17, 2024: Judge Christine M. Gravelle removed from the case. Judge Mark E. Hall added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Michael B. Kaplan on 10/17/2024.. (llb)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 10/18 7:36 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/6/24 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (bwj)
Related: [-] scheduled to be heard by Judge Hall2 Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for Service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Pre Trial Instructions)
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 08/23 10:48 AM
Summons Issued to Vishwadat Matapersad and Shaline Itwaru for Service on Marvin Daniels Answer due on 9/23/2024 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 03:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 10:36 AM
Adversary case 24-01539 Complaint by Vishwadat Matapersad, Shaline Itwaru against Marvin Daniels. Receipt Number 60000564, Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (mmf) Modified TEXT on 8/23/2024 (mmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
court Receipt - Generic - Adversary - Court Use Only Fri 08/23 3:47 PM
Receipt of Adversary Complaint. Fee Amount $350.00, Receipt Number 60000564. Related [+]. Fee received from Lanza Law Firm (bwj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Vishwadat Matapersad, Plaintiff Shaline Itwaru