New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-06380
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Abrams Mfg. Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Golight, Inc.
Represented By
Richard M Lehrer
Fisherbroyles LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Fri 09/13 11:41 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:24-cv-06426, filed on 9/13/2024. (rju)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/06 8:51 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/5/24) (yv) Modified on 9/6/2024 (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court Fri 09/06 2:18 PM
Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re:9 Order, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (yv)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Fri 09/13 8:43 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/28 9:59 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by no later than September 3, 2024, Plaintiff must show cause why venue is proper in the Southern District of New York, or alternatively, why the case should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/27/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
7 7 misc AO 120 Form Patent - Case Opening - Submitted Mon 08/26 12:31 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 08/26 12:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abrams Mfg. Co., Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/26 12:22 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/26 12:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/26 12:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/23 7:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abrams Mfg. Co., Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Golight, Inc...(Lehrer, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/23 6:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Golight, Inc...(Lehrer, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Fri 08/23 6:49 PM
AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Lehrer, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/23 6:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lehrer, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 6:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Abrams Mfg. Co., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29796221)Document filed by Golight, Inc...(Lehrer, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - '392 Patent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Product Images,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Notice Letter