Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:24-cv-12178
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2410 Quiet Title
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Case in other court:Plymouth County Superior Court, 2483CV00543
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:54 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue
Represented By
Diane M McCarron
Ma Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Cross Defendant
Kenneth T. Lounge
Defendant
Denice Brine
Defendant
Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue
Represented By
Diane M McCarron
Ma Dept. Of Revenue
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth T. Lounge
Defendant
Michael D. Lounge
Defendant
William R. Lounge
Defendant
The Heirs, Devisees and Legal Representatives of the Estate of Kathryn G. Lounge
Defendant
United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Franklin D. Sandrea-Rivero
Doj-Tax
contact info
Plaintiff
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
c/o 3900 Capital City Boulevard
Santa Ana, MI 48906
Represented By
Erika L. Vogel
Bendett & Mchugh, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
18 18 utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/14 12:30 PM
Reset Answer Deadlines as Counsel entered the incorrect date of service: Kenneth T. Lounge 4/17/2025; William R. Lounge 4/17/2025. (MBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/06 3:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed William R. Lounge served on 3/25/2025, answer due 4/15/2025. (Marchifrazier, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kenneth T. Lounge served on 3/27/2025, answer due 4/17/2025. (Marchifrazier, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/15 3:01 PM
Clerk's Notes for Status Conference held remotely by Zoom before Judge Brian E. Murphy: Plaintiff making progress in contacting defendants and will file a motion to clarify returns of service. Plaintiff also anticipates circulating a proposed agreement with the IRS and Department of Revenue in the next 60 days. Further conference set. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 2:30 p.m. remotely by Zoom before Judge Brian E. Murphy. (Court Reporter: Jessica Leonard at jessica@wickedsteno.com.)(Attorneys present: Marchifrazier for Vogel, McCarron, Sandrea-Rivero) (BIB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/13 11:28 AM
Clerk's Notes for Scheduling Conference held remotely by Zoom before Judge Brian E. Murphy: Counsel discusses the posture of the case and their efforts to contact family members. Further conference set. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 2:00 p.m. remotely by Zoom before Judge Brian E. Murphy. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. (Court Reporter: Jessica Leonard at jessicamichaelleonard@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Vogel, McCarron, Sandrea-Rivero) (BIB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Wed 03/12 3:45 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/10 3:15 PM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ORDER OF DISMISSAL...For failure of the plaintiff to file a return of service and/or show good cause why service has not been made pursuant to the Conditional Order of Dismissal issued on February 14, 2025, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1(b) as to the above-named defendants ONLY. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of potential dismissal pursuant to FRCP 4m Sun 02/16 4:23 PM
CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL...Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), and Local Rule 4.1(b), the above-entitled action will be dismissed without prejudice as to the above defendants ONLY in twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order unless a proof of service is filed or good cause shown why these defendants should not be dismissed. (BIB)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Sun 02/16 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is SCHEDULED for 3/13/2025 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 12 (In person only) before Judge Brian E. Murphy.(BIB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Template Scheduling Order
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Reassignment Wed 01/29 11:42 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy added. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 11/04 4:20 PM
MA Dept. of Revenue ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Kenneth T. Lounge by Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Department of Revenue.(McCarron, Diane)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 27, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 10/27 11:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service.(Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
6 6 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 10/04 9:55 AM
STATE COURT Record United States of America - Internal Revenue Service summons served on 7/29/2024, answer due 10/29/2024..(Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Records
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 09/03 11:35 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/29/2024 to File Answer to Complaint United States of America - Internal Revenue Service answer due 10/29/2024. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/30 10:47 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/29/2024 to File Answer to Complaint by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service.(Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 24, 2024
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Sat 08/24 9:33 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 08/23 2:57 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 08/23 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service ( Fee Status: US Government)(Sandrea-Rivero, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet