New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:24-cv-05916
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
A&J Produce Corp.
Represented By
Damarr M. Butler
Jones Day
contact info
Jessica Kastin
Jones Day
contact info
Mary Katherine Callesen
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Armando Gerpe
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alex Weiler
Represented By
Damarr M. Butler
Jones Day
contact info
Jessica Kastin
Jones Day
contact info
Mary Katherine Callesen
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Defendant
WG Fruit & Veg Corp.
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Our Girls Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Our Girls, LLC
Defendant
Thomas Tramutola, Jr.
Represented By
Damarr M. Butler
Jones Day
contact info
Jessica Kastin
Jones Day
contact info
Mary Katherine Callesen
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Defendant
3J's Trucking, LLC
Represented By
Damarr M. Butler
Jones Day
contact info
Jessica Kastin
Jones Day
contact info
Mary Katherine Callesen
Jones Day - Washington
contact info
Defendant
Mario Traina, Jr.
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
T&G Brokerage, LLC
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mary Traina
Represented By
Rebecca Kim Kimura
Bond Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Camisha L. Parkins
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Daniel F. Murphy
Bond, Schoeneck & King, PLLC
contact info
John Martin Harras
Bond, Schoeneck & King PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Rosa
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Roy
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP 225 Broadway Suite 1405
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Pacifico
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Machadio
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Kane, Jr.
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Myra Gordon
Represented By
Milo S. Silberstein
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Marc David Braverman
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman, LLP
contact info
Amanda Elizabeth Maguire
Dealy Silberstein & Braverman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/28 5:11 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting39 : Discovery responses now due on or before 5/30/2025 . Status Conference is adjourned to 6/10/2025 @ 2:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. The conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 2:45 PM . Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. No further adjournments of these deadlines should be anticipated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/28/2025. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
39 39 motion Adjourn Conference Sun 04/27 6:38 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by 3J's Trucking, LLC, A&J Produce Corp., Thomas Tramutola, Jr., Alex Weiler. (Callesen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
38 38 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 03/18 4:37 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Myra Gordon, Daniel Kane, Jr, Charles Machadio, Vincent Pacifico, Anthony Rosa, Andrew Roy. (Silberstein, Milo)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/18 4:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting38 Parties granted an additional thirty (30) days to April 28, 2025 to respond to the discovery requests while the parties discuss settlement. Status Conference is adjourned to 4/30/2025 @ 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. The conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:45 AM. Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 3/18/2025. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
37 37 misc Stipulation Wed 01/29 4:11 PM
STIPULATION by Thomas Tramutola, Jr., A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine Callesen on behalf of Alex Weiler (aty to be noticed) (Callesen, Mary)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Damarr M. Butler on behalf of Alex Weiler (aty to be noticed) (Butler, Damarr)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kastin on behalf of Alex Weiler (aty to be noticed) (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Murphy on behalf of WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Murphy, Daniel)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kim Kimura on behalf of WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kimura, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/15 10:41 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 1/14/2025. Appearances for Plaintiff: Milo Silberstein \ Marc Braverman. Appearances for Defendants: Damarr Butler, Jessica Kastin (A&J Produce, 3Js Trucking, Thomas Tramutola, Jr.); Rebecca Kimura (no notice of appearance filed - COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE), John Harras, Camisha Parkins, Daniel Murphy (no notice of appearance filed - COUNSEL MUST FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE) (WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Our Girls Trucking, Inc., Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe). Discovery schedule set: Initial disclosures due 1/28/2025. Parties to exchange document requests and interrogatories by 2/28/2025 - responses due 3/28/2025. Status conference set for 4/2/2025 @ 10:15 AM. The conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:15 AM . Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. (FTR: 10:21 - 10:35) (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Milo S. Silberstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Silberstein, Milo)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Elizabeth Maguire on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Maguire, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Camisha L. Parkins on behalf of WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Parkins, Camisha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/04 3:10 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc.. (Harras, John)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/04 3:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Our Girls Trucking, Inc. (Harras, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/22 5:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, by Thomas Tramutola, Jr., A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC. (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 4:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC identifying Corporate Parent A&J Produce Corp., Other Affiliate 3J's Trucking, LLC for A&J Produce Corp.. (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 10:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure that the attorney receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $200 admission fee is or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/12/2024. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Mon 11/11 2:21 PM
Letter Pursuant to Magistrate Pollak's Electronic Order Entered November 8, 2024 by Thomas Tramutola, Jr., A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC (Butler, Damarr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 23)
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 4:51 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure that the attorney receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $200 admission fee is or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/8/2024. (LMD)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 11/08 4:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re23 : The motion for admission pro hac vice filed by Damarr Butler, Esq., fails to comply with Local Civil Rule 1.3(k). The sworn Affidavit submitted with the attorney's application does not indicate which law firm employs the applicant, nor does it indicate which party the applicant seeks to represent pro hac vice . The applicant may correct this deficiency by 11/22/2024 by attaching compliant documentation as an exhibit to a letter filed on ECF; applicant need not file a new motion for admission. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/8/2024. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/06 4:37 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Tramutola, Jr., A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC. (Butler, Damarr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Damarr M. Butler in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia,
Att: 3 Exhibit Letter of Admission - Illinois,
Att: 4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Maryland
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kastin on behalf of Thomas Tramutola, Jr. (aty to be noticed) (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/06 4:03 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18470770 by Thomas Tramutola, Jr., A&J Produce Corp., 3J's Trucking, LLC. (Callesen, Mary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mary K. Callesen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia
Monday, November 04, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/04 3:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/14/2025 @ 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:15 AM . Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/4/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/04 2:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by WG Fruit & Veg Corp., T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc.. (Harras, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/04 3:23 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 12/4/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/4/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Thomas Tramutola, Jr. served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Armando Gerpe served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Mario Traina, Jr. served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Mary Traina served on 10/16/2024, answer due 11/6/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Alex Weiler served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. T&G Brokerage, LLC served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Our Girls, LLC served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. Our Girls Trucking, Inc. served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/18 3:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. WG Fruit & Veg Corp. served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/01 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kastin on behalf of 3J's Trucking, LLC, A&J Produce Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Kastin, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/24 11:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. 3J's Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/24 11:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. A&J Produce Corp. waiver sent on 9/23/2024, answer due 11/22/2024. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 10:23 AM
Summons Issued as to 3J's Trucking, LLC, A&J Produce Corp., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc., Our Girls, LLC, T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Thomas Tramutola, Jr., WG Fruit & Veg Corp., Alex Weiler. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/29 3:21 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,, by Myra Gordon, Daniel Kane, Jr, Charles Machadio, Vincent Pacifico, Anthony Rosa, Andrew Roy (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 08/28 9:35 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. Only one Summons is required with all Defendant's listed in the caption. Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (ENE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/27 5:10 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,, by Myra Gordon, Daniel Kane, Jr, Charles Machadio, Vincent Pacifico, Anthony Rosa, Andrew Roy (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons 3 J's,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Our Girls Trucking,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Our Girls,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons WG,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons T&G,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Tramutola,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Weiler,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Mary Traina,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Mario Traina,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Gerpe
Monday, August 26, 2024
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 08/26 2:52 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 08/26 2:50 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/26 2:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 08/26 2:49 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against 3J's Trucking, LLC, A&J Produce Corp., Armando Gerpe, Our Girls Trucking, Inc., Our Girls, LLC, T&G Brokerage, LLC, Mary Traina, Mario Traina, Jr., Thomas Tramutola, Jr., WG Fruit & Veg Corp., Alex Weiler filing fee $ 405, receipt number BNYEDC-18209209 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Charles Machadio, Daniel Kane, Jr, Andrew Roy, Anthony Rosa, Myra Gordon, Vincent Pacifico. (Braverman, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons A&J,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons 3J's,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Our Girls Trucking,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Our Girls,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons WG,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons T&G,
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Tramutola,
Att: 9 Proposed Summons Weiler,
Att: 10 Proposed Summons Mary Traina,
Att: 11 Proposed Summons Mario Traina,
Att: 12 Proposed Summons Gerpe