Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-33862

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:24-bk-33863
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC
3000 Research Forest Dr Ste 150
Spring, TX 77381-4395
Represented By
Robert C Lane
The Lane Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago
Friday, November 01, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/01 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Generic Order
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
12 12 order Generic Order Wed 10/30 1:21 PM
Copy of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC, docketed in main case # 24-33862 Signed on 10/30/2024 (njc7)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 misc Tax Documents Fri 09/20 9:29 AM
Tax Documents for the Year 2023. Tax documents are available for reviewing in the office of the clerk (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 misc Balance Sheet Fri 09/06 3:36 PM
Balance Sheet (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Operations Tue 09/03 8:55 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/28 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration
7 7 misc Cash Flow Statement Wed 08/28 8:04 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
6 6 court Entry Mon 08/26 12:53 PM
An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the following Chapter 11 Sub V cases for procedural purposes only: Abundant Life Chiropractic, P.A., Case No. 24-33862 and Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC, Case. No. 24-33863 The docket in Case No. 24-33862 (EVR) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (njc7)
Related: [-]
5 5 6 pgs order Order for Joint Administration Mon 08/26 12:51 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Sub V Cases. Related [+] Signed on 8/26/2024. (njc7)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 misc Declaration Mon 08/26 7:53 AM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ) Related [+] (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
3 3 misc Proposed Order Mon 08/26 7:04 AM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC ) Related [+] (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Joint Administration
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/26 9:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Andrew Jimenez (Jimenez, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 motion Joint Administration Fri 08/23 2:45 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Att: 2 Proposed Order
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Fri 08/23 2:32 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Renew Life Rejuvenation of The Woodlands, PLLC. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 08/23 2:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-33863 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25520636. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]