North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:24-cv-00771
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
City of Charlotte
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Lauren Federowicz
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Ratchford
Represented By
Lori R. Keeton
The Law Offices Of Lori Keeton
contact info
Defendant
Tawan Skeen
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jose Torres
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Wood
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Erik Torres
Represented By
Taylor Imperiale
Charlotte City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Khairi Williams
Represented By
Darlene Harris
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
48 48 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/05 9:07 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Erik Torres. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
47 47 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/29 7:59 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Khairi Williams. Replies due by 2/5/2025 (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
46 46 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/15 4:57 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Erik Torres.(Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
45 45 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 01/15 4:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Erik Torres. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/15 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Erik Torres. Responses due by 1/29/2025 (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/09 3:05 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jose Torres, Ryan Wood. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
42 42 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/03 1:11 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Four (4) to Five (5) Days. Discovery due by 5/27/2025. Mediation deadline set for 6/10/2025. Motions due by 6/24/2025. Jury Trial set for 11/3/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/3/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
41 41 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Mon 12/02 9:05 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/02 5:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Khairi Williams. Replies due by 12/9/2024 (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/25 10:58 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Ratchford. (Keeton, Lori)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 11/25 11:46 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lauren Federowicz, City of Charlotte, Tawan Skeen.(Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Captain Joan Gallant
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/20 8:01 AM
ORDER granting with modification Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiff shall effectuate service of process on Defendant Erik Torres on or before January 17, 2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/19/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
36 36 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 7:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khairi Williams. Erik Torres waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/19 2:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process of Defendant Erik Torres by Khairi Williams. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, November 18, 2024
34 34 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 8:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss by Khairi Williams. Replies due by 11/25/2024 (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
33 33 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 8:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Khairi Williams. Replies due by 11/25/2024 (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/18 12:45 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Jose Torres, Ryan Wood.(Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
31 31 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 11/18 12:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jose Torres, Ryan Wood. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/18 12:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jose Torres, Ryan Wood. Responses due by 12/2/2024 (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 11/05 3:08 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Seal. All exhibits to Plaintiffs "Amended Complaint" (Document No. 3 ) shall remain under SEAL until otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/5/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Seal Document Tue 11/05 7:32 AM
Consent MOTION to Seal Document by Khairi Williams. Responses due by 11/19/2024 (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, November 04, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 10:26 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Matthew Ratchford.(Keeton, Lori)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 11/04 10:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Ratchford. Responses due by 11/18/2024 (Keeton, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Mon 11/04 4:11 PM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Seal Document. All exhibits to Defendants City Of Charlotte, Officer Skeen, And Officer Federowiczs Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss (Document No. 22) shall remain under SEAL until otherwise ordered by this Court. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/4/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/04 12:39 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Lauren Federowicz, City of Charlotte, Tawan Skeen.(Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Seal Document Mon 11/04 12:27 PM
Consent MOTION to Seal Document by Lauren Federowicz, City of Charlotte, Tawan Skeen. Responses due by 11/18/2024 (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
22 22 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 11/04 12:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lauren Federowicz, City of Charlotte, Tawan Skeen. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/04 12:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lauren Federowicz, City of Charlotte, Tawan Skeen. Responses due by 11/18/2024 (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Wed 10/30 12:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. Jose Torres served on 10/27/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Wed 10/30 12:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/29 12:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. Ryan Wood served on 10/26/2024, answer due 11/18/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
17 17 service Summons Reissued Thu 10/24 11:57 AM
Summons Reissued Electronically as to Erik Torres. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 11:56 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Jose Torres. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 10/24 10:32 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Ryan Wood. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/24 2:57 PM
ORDER granting Defendant Matthew Ratchford's 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 3 First Amended Complaint. Matthew Ratchford answer due 11/4/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/24/24. (mga)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/24 1:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:3 Amended Complaint by Matthew Ratchford. (Keeton, Lori)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 09/23 7:35 AM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 3 Amended Complaint . Lauren Federowicz and Tawan Skeen answer due 11/4/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/20/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/20 3:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:3 Amended Complaint by Lauren Federowicz, Tawan Skeen. (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/20 10:39 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khairi Williams. City of Charlotte waiver sent on 9/5/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Imperiale on behalf of City of Charlotte, Lauren Federowicz, Tawan Skeen (Imperiale, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:46 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Charlotte. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 09/09 2:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. Matthew Ratchford served on 9/7/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/05 9:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. Lauren Federowicz served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/05 9:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Khairi Williams. Tawan Skeen served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. (Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/26 2:09 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Erik Torres. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/26 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Khairi Williams.(Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/26 8:46 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Lauren Federowicz, Matthew Ratchford, Tawan Skeen. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (add)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6642164), filed by Khairi Williams.(Harris, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/23 3:51 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Fri 08/23 3:51 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Fri 08/23 3:51 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (add)
Related: [-]