New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:24-cv-06393
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Plaintiff
Topix Media Lab LLC
14 Wall Street
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Ryan Michael Gainor
Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Comag Marketing Group, LLC
Terminated: 08/30/2024
1955 Lake Park Drive
Smyrna, GA 30080
Defendant
a360 Media Company, LLC
Terminated: 08/30/2024
1955 Lake Park Drive
Smyrna, GA 30080


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 08/30 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Plaintiff Topix Media Lab LLC hereby dismisses its Complaint against Defendants Comag Marketing Group, LLC and a360 Media Company LLC without prejudice. Comag Marketing Group, LLC and a360 Media Company, LLC terminated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/30/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/29 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Comag Marketing Group, LLC, a360 Media Company, LLC. Document filed by Topix Media Lab LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gainor, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 08/27 12:40 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 16, 2024, the Plaintiff shall amend its Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising Topix Media Lab LLC, Comag Marketing Group LLC, and a360 Media Company LLC. If, by that date, the Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to either party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2024.) (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/27/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 08/27 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 12:15 PM before Judge Arun Subramanian. The parties should dial in by calling (646) 453-4442 and entering the Phone Conference ID: 597 918 445, followed by the pound (#) sign. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Arun Subramanian on 8/27/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 08/26 11:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan Michael Gainor. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/26 11:46 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Arun Subramanian. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/26 11:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/26 11:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/23 4:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gainor, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 4:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Comag Marketing Group, LLC, a360 Media Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29795356)Document filed by Topix Media Lab LLC..(Gainor, Ryan)
Related: [-]