Texas Western District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Case #: 3:24-cv-00303
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 19, 2025 3:13 AM CST
Defendant
Texas Department of Insurance
Represented By
Edward L. Marshall
Assistant Attorney General
contact info
Roy L. Adams
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacob Barreras
2211 E. Missouri Avenue #221
El Paso, TX 79903


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
41 41 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 04/25 4:56 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of35 Certified Mailing (mao)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 04/25 4:55 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of36 Certified Mailing (mao)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 04/25 4:55 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of38 Certified Mailing (mao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
38 38 misc Certified Mailing Thu 04/17 11:04 AM
Certified Mailing of37 Order on Motion to Dismiss (mao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 04/17 10:42 AM
DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE-FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDER MOOTING26 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING32 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (mao)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Certified Mailing Wed 04/16 3:36 PM
Certified Mailing of34 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Recusal etc. (mao)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Certified Mailing Wed 04/16 3:35 PM
Certified Mailing of33 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (mao)
Related: [-]
34 34 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Recusal Wed 04/16 3:24 PM
ORDER DENYING8 Motion ; DENYING30 Motion ; DENYING31 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (mao)
Related: [-]
33 33 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 04/16 3:15 PM
ORDER DENYING9 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (mao)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 motion Dismiss Fri 01/17 10:48 AM
Amended MOTION to Dismiss ("Defendant informs the Court that the Amended Motion to Dismiss is substantively identical to the previously filed Corrected Motion to Dismiss. The sole addition in the Amended Motion to Dismiss is the inclusion of a Certificate of Conference, which attests that Plaintiff has been served with the Corrected Motion to Dismiss.") by Texas Department of Insurance.(Adams, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
notice Deficiency Notice Thu 01/16 9:41 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 27 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss ***CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE DOES NOT INDICATE HOW THE PLAINTIFF WAS SERVED. THE PLAINTIFF IS A PRO SE FILER AND WILL NOT RECEIVE ELECTRONIC NOTICE VIA THE COURT'S CM/ECF SYSTEM. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
31 31 motion Recusal Fri 01/03 4:52 PM
MOTION for Recusal by Jacob Barreras.(ep1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 DOCKET SHEET
Thursday, December 19, 2024
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/19 4:35 PM
MOTION TO ADDRESS UNRESOLVED ADA ACCOMMODATIONS by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
29 29 misc Advisory to the Court Thu 12/12 3:10 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Texas Department of Insurance . (Adams, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
28 28 misc Proposed Order Wed 11/06 4:50 PM
Proposed Order Granting to27 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Department of Insurance. (Adams, Roy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Tue 10/22 11:39 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Department of Insurance. (Adams, Roy)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss Tue 10/22 10:35 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Texas Department of Insurance. (Adams, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
25 25 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 10/17 3:07 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of21 Order (mv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
24 24 misc Response Wed 10/16 3:32 PM
RESPONSE to21 Order by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/08 5:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Texas Department of Insurance served on 10/3/2024, answer due 10/24/2024. (ep1)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certified Mailing Tue 10/08 5:07 PM
Certified Mailing of21 Order (ep1)
Related: [-]
21 21 3 pgs order Order Tue 10/08 1:57 PM
ORDER CONCERNING FILING SUBSEQUENT COMPLAINTS. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
20 20 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 10/03 4:09 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of19 Certified Mailing (ep1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 misc Certified Mailing Fri 09/27 12:52 PM
Certified Mailing of17 Order (mv)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Fri 09/27 11:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Texas Department of Insurance. (mv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Fri 09/27 10:36 AM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (mv)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 09/26 5:08 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of13 Certified Mailing (ep1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 misc Response Wed 09/25 12:54 PM
RESPONSE to12 Order by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 misc Certified Mail Receipt Fri 09/20 9:22 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of11 Certified Mailing, (ep1)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certified Mailing Thu 09/19 2:09 PM
Certified Mailing of12 Order (ep1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/18 2:05 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff advise the Court of Defendants address at which the agency may be served with process no later than October 7, 2024. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 misc Certified Mailing Fri 09/13 5:30 PM
Certified Mailing of8 MOTION REQUEST FOR INTERPRETERS AND AIDES UNDER THE REHABILITATION ACT OF 1990,7 Complaint,9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel,10 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted,6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (mv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Thu 09/12 10:48 AM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 09/12 10:47 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/12 10:46 AM
MOTION REQUEST FOR INTERPRETERS AND AIDES UNDER THE REHABILITATION ACT OF 1990 by Jacob Barreras. (ep1)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Thu 09/12 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT, filed by Jacob Barreras.(ep1)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/11 6:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 misc Certified Mail Receipt Tue 09/10 4:03 PM
Certified Mail Receipt of4 Certified Mailing (ep1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
4 4 misc Certified Mailing Tue 09/03 4:09 PM
Certified Mailing of3 Order Reassigning Case,2 Order of Recusal (ep1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 08/30 3:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael Joseph Truncale for all proceedings. Chief Judge Alia Moses no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (ep1)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 08/30 11:30 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL AND TRANSFER. District Judge Leon Schydlower recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Alia Moses for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 08/23 5:07 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob Barreras.(mv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Motion for Interpreter,
Att: 3 Motion for App. of Counsel,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Fri 08/23 5:03 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (mv)
Related: [-]