California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00423
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 12:15 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Donovan Miguel McKendrick
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Keybin Eloy Rodriguez (1)
Terminated: 08/16/2024
Represented By
Daniel P Blank
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/25/2024 12:50 AM PDT
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez (1). (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet
3 3 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 3 Motion to Seal as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez (1).(exl, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Keybin Eloy Rodriguez re1 Complaint (Sealed): Initial Appearance/Complaint set for 7/25/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Initial Appearance as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez held on 7/25/2024 The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Interpreter Needed in case as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez, Added attorney Daniel P Blank for Keybin Eloy Rodriguez. Status Conference set for 7/30/2024 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge. Govt. moves to unseal entire case. Court orders entire case unsealed. Govt. moves to exclude time STA effec. prep. of counsel: 7/25/2024 - 7/30/2024. (paper copy submitted). Court order time excluded: 7/25/2024 -7/30/2024. Recording Time Liberty: 11:06-11:12. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
6 6 Stipulated Order Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act and Waiver Under FRCP 5.1 as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 7/25/2024. (exl, COURT STAFF) [3:24-mj-71096-MAG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Warrant Returned Executed on 7/24/2024. as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 INFORMATION as to Keybin Eloy Rodriguez (1) count(s) 1. (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Penalty Sheet