Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00339
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:44 AM EST
Cross Claimant
100 N Main Owner, LLC
Represented By
William M. Dolan, III
Adler Pollock & Sheehan
contact info
Lucas Spremulli
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
110 North Main Management, LLC
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
110 North Main, LLC
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Robert L. Shaffer
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Vision Construction Management, Inc.
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Defendant
100 N Main Owner, LLC
Represented By
William M. Dolan, III
Adler Pollock & Sheehan
contact info
Lucas Spremulli
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Defendant
110 North Main Management, LLC
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Defendant
110 North Main, LLC
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ABC Corps 1-10
Defendant
Jane Doe 1-10
Defendant
John Doe 1-10
Defendant
Robert L. Shaffer
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vision Construction Management, Inc.
Represented By
James G. Atchison
Casner & Edwards, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lighthouse Masonry, Inc.
Represented By
Eric E. Renner
Duffy & Sweeney Ltd
contact info
Robert M. Duffy
Duffy & Sweeney, Ltd.
contact info

GPO Jan 13 2025
ORDER : The Court GRANTS Lighthouse's Motion and issues a writ or prejudgment attachment in the amount of $1,682,569.96, plus interest and costs, attaching all Defendants' real, personal and intangible property to secure payment of the Judgment. ECF 3. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/13/2025. (Potter, Carrie)
GPO Jan 22 2025
ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/22/2025. (Jackson, Ryan)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
56 56 motion Default Judgment Thu 05/15 2:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Vision Construction Management, Inc., 110 North Main, LLC and 110 North Main Management, LLC filed by Lighthouse Masonry, Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] nner, Eric