Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-12027

Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Janice D Loyd
Case #: 5:24-ap-01054
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
MRV Banks, a Missouri Bank, d/b/a Revvi VISA
871 Sainte Genevieve Dr.
Sainte Genevieve, MO 63670
Represented By
MRV Banks
contact info
Defendant
Vervent, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a Revvi VISA
10182 Telesis Ct. Suite 300
San Diego, CA 92121
Represented By
Vervent, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey David Nachimson
10413 Lyndon Rd.
Oklahoma City, OK 73120
Represented By
Anita F Sanders
Anita F Sanders, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/24 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-1054 Closed (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 01/07 7:48 AM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice Adversary 5:24-ap-1054 Filed by Anita F Sanders on behalf of Jeffrey David Nachimson. (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 17, 2024
11 11 motion Default Judgment Sun 11/17 8:51 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against MRV Banks and Vervent, Inc.. Related [+]. Filed by Anita F Sanders on behalf of Jeffrey David Nachimson.. (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-] 8 Entry of Default by Clerk,9 Entry of Default by Clerk8 Entry of Default by Clerk,9 Entry of Default by Clerk
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Complaint [Doc. No. 1]
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Summons to MRV Banks [Doc. No. 3]
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Summons to Vervent [Doc. No. 4]
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Service of Complaint Summons MRV [Doc. No. 5]
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Serv Summons Complaint Vervent [Doc. No. 6]
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6-App for Entry of Default by Clerk re MRV Banks [Doc. No. 7]
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6(A)-Affidavit re App for Entry of Default [Doc. No. 7-1]
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7-Clerk Entry of Default MRV [Doc. No. 8]
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8-Clerk's Entry of Default Vervent [Doc. No. 9]
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9-Opposing Counsel Entry of Appearance [Doc. No. 10]
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10-Proposed Order per Local Rule 7055-1(C)
Thursday, October 31, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 10/31 11:04 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Mary Tolbert of Steptoe & Johnson PLLC on behalf of MRV Banks, Vervent, Inc.. (Tolbert, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 court Entry of Default by Clerk Wed 10/16 2:51 PM
Entry of Default by the Clerk Against Defendant Vervent, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a Revvi VISA. Related [+] (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-] 7 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey David Nachimson
8 8 court Entry of Default by Clerk Wed 10/16 2:47 PM
Entry of Default by the Clerk Against Defendant MRV Banks, a Missouri Bank, d/b/a Revvi VISA. Related [+] (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-] 7 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey David Nachimson
7 7 motion Entry of Default Court Clerk Wed 10/16 9:50 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Court Clerk With Affidavit Attached . Filed by Anita F Sanders on behalf of Jeffrey David Nachimson. (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Application for Entry of Default
Sunday, September 01, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 09/01 4:01 PM
Summons Service Executed Party Served: Vervent, Inc., d/b/a Revvi VISA Date Served: August 31, 2024 Type of Service: Mail Service (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Summons Served on Vervent, Inc.
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Complaint Served on Vervent, Inc.
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 09/01 3:59 PM
Summons Service Executed Party Served: MRV Banks, a Missouri Bank, d/b/a Revvi VISA Date Served: August 31, 2024 Type of Service: Mail Service (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Summons Served to MRV Banks
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Complaint Served on MRV Banks
Monday, August 26, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued - Adversary Mon 08/26 2:20 PM
Summons Issued on Vervent, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a Revvi VISA. (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued - Adversary Mon 08/26 2:19 PM
Summons Issued on MRV Banks, a Missouri Bank, d/b/a Revvi VISA. (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/26 4:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Anita F Sanders on behalf of Jeffrey David Nachimson. (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp (auto) Complaint Mon 08/26 4:54 AM
Adversary case 24-01054 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)}, (72 (Injunctive relief - other)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Jeffrey David Nachimson against Vervent, Inc., MRV Banks. Exempt from fees. (Sanders, Anita)
Related: [-]
court Court Correction Mon 08/26 2:18 PM
Court Correction Advisory: The Defendant names was entered out of order when the adversary case was opened. The Clerk's Office has corrected the defendant names to match the Complaint. (dwebs, ca) Modified on 8/26/2024 to correct the text color (arucker, ca)
Related: [-]