Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 6:24-cv-03252
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 4:53 AM CST
Defendant
Luke Arthur
Defendant
Simple Grow Soil, LLC
Defendant
Simple Solar, LLC
Plaintiff
Dale Derischebourg
Represented By
Jose S Caldera
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info
Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeff Derischebourg
Represented By
Jose S Caldera
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info
Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald W. Hisel
Represented By
Jose S Caldera
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info
Jackie Lee Rodgers, Jr
Smith Lewis, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 order Clerk's Judgment Fri 02/21 11:27 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 02/21 11:25 AM
ORDER granting13 motion for default judgment. Signed on 2/21/25 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Modified on 2/21/2025 to reflect copies of this Order and Judgment were mailed to: Simple Grow Soil LLC, 1475 S. Sam Houston Blvd, Houston, MO 65483; Simple Solar LLC, 1475 S. Sam Houston Blvd, Houston MO 65483; and Luke Arthur, 8792 Hwy 63, Houston, MO 65483. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
14 14 misc Affidavit Fri 01/31 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF JOSE CALDERA by Dale Derischebourg, Jeff Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel. (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
13 13 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/22 5:11 PM
MOTION for default judgment filed by Jose S Caldera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/5/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Mon 12/30 11:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C Wimes for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris no longer assigned to case. Please note new case number: 24-3252 CV-S-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Fri 12/27 12:58 PM
ORDER directing that the Clerk of the Court randomly assign this case to an Article III District Court Judge for all further proceedings. Signed on 12/27/24 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 12/27 12:52 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Luke Arthur, Simple Grow Soil, LLC, Simple Solar, LLC. (Crocker, Susan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 misc Affidavit Wed 12/11 3:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT re7 MOTION for default judgment of Dale Derischebourg by Dale Derischebourg, Jeff Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel. Related [+] (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
8 8 order Order Tue 12/10 12:15 PM
Before the Court is Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default [Doc. 7]. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs file an affidavit or declaration in support of their motion no later than December 18, 2024, as required by Rule 55(a). Signed on 12/10/24 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/09 2:11 PM
MOTION for default judgment filed by Jose S Caldera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/23/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/22 12:11 PM
ORDER that Plaintiffs file a status report or other motion regarding the claims against all Defendants no later than December 13, 2024. See Order for Details. Signed on 11/22/24 by Magistrate Judge Jill A. Morris. (Leonard, MacKenzie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Fri 09/20 2:17 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 10/11/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/11 1:25 PM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Simple Grow Soil, LLC on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/11 1:22 PM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Simple Solar, LLC on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/11 1:20 PM
RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Dale Derischebourg, Ronald W. Hisel, Jeff Derischebourg. Waiver sent to Luke Arthur on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Caldera, Jose)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPNII Mon 08/26 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/26 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jose S Caldera on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9172626. Service due by 11/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Caldera, Jose) (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 (8/26/2024) Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 08/26 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiffs: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 9/16/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]