Kansas District Court
Judge:Holly L Teeter
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 5:24-cv-04086
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:04 AM CST
Defendant
Mike (lnu)
Defendant
Cedar Run Apartment Owners
Defendant
Danita Collins
Defendant
Mid America Management Owners
Represented By
Brandon MacDonald
Wallace Saunders
contact info
James L. Sanders
Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - Op
contact info
Defendant
Linda Carpenter
Defendant
Mid America Management
Defendant
Mid America Management Board Members
Defendant
Ronald Paul Schwager
Plaintiff
Mary Anne Sause
E-Filing & ECF Notifications 5620 SW 22nd St. Apt. 212
Topeka, KS 66614
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mid America Board Members
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Defendant
Roger Schwager
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Represented By
Brandon MacDonald
Wallace Saunders
contact info
James L. Sanders
Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - Op
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
67 67 order Order on Motion for Order Fri 05/02 1:39 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice66 Motion for Order. Plaintiff notes that she received a summons and may be selected for jury service. She has not been selected at this time. Thus, an extension is not currently warranted. Her response to the motion to dismiss therefore remains due on or before May 14, 2025. If she is selected for jury service, she may seek an extension when she has more details (e.g., length of trial, etc). Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/2/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
Related: [-]
66 66 3 pgs motion Order Fri 05/02 11:57 AM
MOTION for Order (titled: Motion for Possible Leave for Jury Duty) by Plaintiff Mary Anne Sause. Related [+] (kmc)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz