Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: Rebecca Rutherford
Case #: 3:24-cv-02179
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:13 AM CST
Defendant
Lucifer
Plaintiff
Mocha C Brown
2735 Villa Creek Drive, Suite 285
Farmers Branch, TX 75234


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Tue 10/15 3:49 PM
JUDGMENT: The plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Clerk shall transmit a true copy of this Judgment and the Order Accepting the Findings and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge to the plaintiff. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/15/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Tue 10/15 3:40 PM
Order Accepting7 Findings and Recommendations. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/15/2024) (ndt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 10/15 3:49 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Oct 15 15:49:43 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
7 7 motion Findings and Recommendations Mon 09/16 2:28 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court should dismiss this lawsuit with prejudice as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/16/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/16 9:34 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Upon consideration, the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 5] is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/16/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 09/16 11:03 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 16 11:03:44 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 09/16 2:29 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Sep 16 14:29:02 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/26 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mocha C Brown (ykp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 08/26 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mocha C Brown. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (ykp)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 08/26 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lucifer filed by Mocha C Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 08/26 4:20 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
Related: [-]
1 1 qcref Godbey Mon 08/26 4:19 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 08/26 4:25 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Aug 26 16:25:36 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]