Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:24-cv-05697
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 2:59 AM PST
Defendant
Joseph Turner
Plaintiff
Kurt S Peterson
432 PARKWOOD BLVD
SEQUIM, WA 98382


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/02 5:03 PM
ORDER. Because Plaintiff has failed to cure the filing deficiency in accordance with the Court's order, the clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 08/26 2:57 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re Kurt S Peterson re1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/25/2024 to correct IFP application (CJS) Modified on 8/26/2024 - cc: Plaintiff via USPS (CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Form,
Att: 2 AO 121 Form
2 2 misc Letter Mon 08/26 2:40 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CJS)(cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Proposed Document(s) Mon 08/26 2:37 PM
PROPOSED Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kurt S Peterson.(CJS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Envelope