New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-06438
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:52 AM EST
Defendant
Ashley Fass
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Brian Christopher Dunning
Dunning Rievman & Macdonald LLP
contact info
Irene Ribeiro Gee
Dunning Rievman & Macdonald LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Give Back Beauty Americas LLC
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Aubre G. Dean
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Samuel David Levy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Give Back Beauty Holding Ltd
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Aubre G. Dean
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Samuel David Levy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Give Back Beauty International LLC
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Aubre G. Dean
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Samuel David Levy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Give Back Beauty S.A.
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Aubre G. Dean
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Samuel David Levy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Give Back Beauty, LLC
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Aubre G. Dean
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Samuel David Levy
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Andrew T. Hambelton
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vanessa Kidd
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Reid Mulvihill
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dominick Romeo
Represented By
Ryan Q Keech
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
John J. Cotter
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Ronie Malka Schmelz
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Avril Love
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Arden, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Dockterman
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Elyse D. Echtman
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Revlon Consumer Products LLC
Represented By
Michael Dockterman
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Elyse D. Echtman
Steptoe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
150 150 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 05/05 11:26 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), the joint stipulation to dismiss this action with prejudice between Plaintiffs Revlon Consumer Products LLC and Elizabeth Arden, Inc., and Defendants Vanessa Kidd, Dominick Romeo, and Reid Mulvihill (collectively the "Individual Defendants") is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Individual Defendants be dismissed with prejudice from this action, and the matter be closed. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/5/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 05/02 8:29 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 149 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
149 149 misc Proposed Order Thu 05/01 7:16 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc., Revlon Consumer Products LLC. Related Document Number:148 ..(Dockterman, Michael)
Related: [-]
148 148 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/01 7:12 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Vanessa Kidd, Reid Mulvihill, Dominick Romeo and without costs. Document filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc., Revlon Consumer Products LLC. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Dockterman, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/01 9:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Michael Dockterman. RE-FILE Document No. 147 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the documents were not filed separately. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents then file the Proposed Order Separately - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
147 147 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/30 11:45 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Vanessa Kidd, Reid Mulvihill, Dominick Romeo and without costs. Document filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc., Revlon Consumer Products LLC. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Dockterman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/29 8:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Michael Dockterman. RE-FILE Document No. 146 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
146 146 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/28 1:43 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Vanessa Kidd, Reid Mulvihill, Dominick Romeo and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Elizabeth Arden, Inc., Revlon Consumer Products LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Dockterman, Michael)
Related: [-]