Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 3:24-bk-32358
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 30, 2024

Debtor
Aero Teardrops LLC
8540 SW Monticello St
Beaverton, OR 97008-7274
Represented By
MICHAEL D O'BRIEN
Michael D O'Brien & Associates PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kenneth S Eiler
515 NW Saltzman Rd - PMB 810
Portland, OR 97229
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204


Docket last updated: 08/27/2024 12:36 AM PDT
Monday, August 26, 2024
crditcrd none Mon 08/26 5:11 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload([LINK 24-32358 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A21868184. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 44 pgs caseupld Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (fee) - case upload Mon 08/26 5:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $338 MICHAEL D O'BRIEN of Michael D O'Brien & Associates PC on behalf of Aero Teardrops LLC. (O'BRIEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 caseupld Electronic Filing Declaration [LBF #5005] Mon 08/26 5:07 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration MICHAEL D O'BRIEN of Michael D O'Brien & Associates PC on behalf of Aero Teardrops LLC. (O'BRIEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 08/26 5:11 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed By Debtor Aero Teardrops LLC (O'BRIEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Mon 08/26 5:14 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Eiler, Kenneth S with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/30/2024 at 11:00AM via Zoom - Eiler: Meeting ID 256 233 8331, Passcode 0626419815, Phone 1-971-368-2681.. (O'BRIEN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]