Original Case: 1:23-cv-01909

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02570
Typecivil / private / civil rights-prisoner
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 4:33 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
DISTRICT ATTORNEY DAUPHIN COUNTY
Represented By
Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Coryn D. Hubbert
Marshall & Farrell
contact info
Donald L. Carmelite
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Yael L. Dadoun
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HARRISBURG POLICE BUREAU
Plaintiff - Appellant
JERRY JERON DANIELS
Represented By
Jerry Jeron Daniels
Frackville SCI
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: RESTREPO, FREEMAN and NYGAARD, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 5. DLD-022. Daniels' motions for appointment of counsel and to compel the Bureau of Prisons are denied as moot.

Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 4:33 AM EST
Monday, August 26, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AWI)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jerry Jeron Daniels in District Court No. 1-23-cv-01909. (AWI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 3 pgs DC Order dated 07/31/2024
Att: 3 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 4 1 pgs Court's Standing Order
Att: 5 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (AWI)
Related: [-]