Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Franklin U Valderrama
Case #: 1:24-cv-07707
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 3:52 AM CST
Defendant
AQ Wholesale
Defendant
Alagoo
Defendant
Luo Alvin
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ambfina US
Defendant
Ashir Store
Defendant
BEFANTST
Defendant
BabyCareDD Store
Defendant
Best Kids Toys Store
Defendant
CS COSDDI
Defendant
CasaReno Online
Defendant
Cashgoodsforsale
Defendant
Cheri shine
Defendant
Children Home Toy Store
Defendant
China Toy Gifts Store
Defendant
Choice Toy Store
Defendant
Coolfox Toys
Defendant
Cutesliving Store
Defendant
DJwolfBaby Store
Defendant
DOLOOWEE
Defendant
Dazzle Store
Defendant
DreamWorks Toys Store
Defendant
EastWest Collects
Defendant
Eniucow
Defendant
Eternity Star
Defendant
FToy Store
Defendant
Funny Mamy Store
Defendant
GG Baby Store
Defendant
GYORI
Defendant
GoodOnePlus Store
Defendant
Grumpys Outdoors
Defendant
HEHEDi
Defendant
HJZWTS
Defendant
Haifeng Online Store
Defendant
Hairun Official Store
Defendant
HappyHouses Store
Defendant
HappyLife1991
Defendant
HelloZ Store
Defendant
HobbyKing Store
Defendant
INOOMP
Defendant
JUNMAIC HENG
Defendant
KERMTIANTIAN
Defendant
Kids Kingdom Toy Store
Defendant
Kidsbele Official Store
Defendant
Life & hope
Defendant
MYGVN Choice Store
Defendant
Mamy Baby Funny Store
Defendant
Meet You Toy Store Store
Defendant
Mengood Direct
Defendant
NO.2 RC drones Store
Defendant
NORABOR KEY
Defendant
NP Baby Store
Defendant
Noiclub
Defendant
Nooly Toys
Defendant
PREPHY
Defendant
PippyPanda Kids Toy Store
Defendant
Q-Boutique Store
Defendant
QLT QIAOLETONG
Defendant
QuickyShippy
Defendant
Quinn Guy
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
Shop1102718693 Store
Defendant
Shop1103116056 Store
Defendant
Smgslib Baby products
Defendant
Soleconvenience
Defendant
Supstem Choice Store
Defendant
TDstore2
Defendant
TEMI
Defendant
TFS TOP FANS
Defendant
Tebos Little Shop
Defendant
The Green General Store
Defendant
The ONE Toy Story Store
Defendant
Toy Promotion Store
Defendant
Toy Treasure Store
Defendant
Toys King Store
Defendant
Unique Toy Game Park
Defendant
Uwitstar
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
XDR Official Store
Defendant
Yiwatto Store
Defendant
Yunyong Online
Defendant
ajdeals23
Defendant
brmart5073
Defendant
chanan_58
Represented By
Patrick M Jones
Aegis Law
contact info
Defendant
cmon8876
Defendant
daidaitoy Store
Defendant
davidm70
Represented By
Patrick M Jones
Aegis Law
contact info
Defendant
deAO
Defendant
enkman
Defendant
hanyim electronic
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
kunminggumanshangmaohang
Defendant
miace-0
Defendant
moonshine1861
Defendant
nissim-0
Defendant
rosecying
Defendant
rucha-186622
Defendant
shelly_1123
Defendant
shijam-41
Defendant
smartlabor
Defendant
tina guo
Represented By
Adam Edward Urbanczyk
Au LLC
contact info
Defendant
zhaofeng2022
Plaintiff
Along Ge
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Terminated: 11/25/2024
Plaintiff
John Doe
Terminated: 09/12/2024
Represented By
Zhiwei Hua
Concord & Sage PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 2:36 AM CST
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (bi, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (bi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT filed by John Doe; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22405855.(Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Patent Certificate,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit Schedule A
2 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 1 Patent Certificate regarding complaint1 (Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff John Doe Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Doe by Zhiwei Hua (Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff John Doe Exhibit 2 Schedule A regarding complaint1 (Hua, Zhiwei)
Related: [-]