Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:24-cv-12218
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
Allison Dorval
Represented By
Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael G. Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Denise Tsai
Wilmerhale LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sekar Kathiresan
Represented By
Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael G. Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Denise Tsai
Wilmerhale LLP
contact info
Defendant
Verve Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By
Tamar Batya Kaplan-Marans
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael G. Bongiorno
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Denise Tsai
Wilmerhale LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Oldroyd
Represented By
Jacob A. Goldberg
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Baker
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 02/04 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Oldroyd (Goldberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 3:46 PM
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule for Amended Complaint and Response Thereto by Thomas Oldroyd. (Goldberg, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 12/11 11:47 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jacob A. Goldberg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/09 6:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jacob A. Goldberg Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10735156 by Thomas Oldroyd.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Jacob A. Goldberg
Friday, December 06, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/09 9:29 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Order Appointing Lead Plaintiff, and Approving Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel. (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 12/09 9:27 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff . (Cowan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
16 16 notice Notice - Other Thu 11/21 1:24 PM
NOTICE by Thomas Oldroyd Of Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Lead Plaintiff (Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
15 15 misc Declaration Mon 10/28 5:48 PM
DECLARATION re13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Thomas Oldroyd.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PSLRA Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit PSLRA Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit Loss Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit Firm Resume
14 14 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 10/28 5:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Thomas Oldroyd. (Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 10/28 5:43 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Thomas Oldroyd.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 order Order Mon 10/28 3:40 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered APPROVING re10 Stipulation filed by Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 10/01 8:00 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tamar Kaplan-Marans. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 09/30 3:49 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Joint) by Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc.. (Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/30 3:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tamar Kaplan-Marans Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10625053 by Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc..(Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Tamar Kaplan-Marans in Support
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/30 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Tsai on behalf of Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc. (Tsai, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 3:18 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc. for Verve Therapeutics, Inc... (Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Bongiorno on behalf of Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc. (Bongiorno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/06 11:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Oldroyd. Allison Dorval waiver sent on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024; Sekar Kathiresan waiver sent on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024; Verve Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver for S. Kathiresan,
Att: 2 Waiver for A. Dorval
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order Wed 08/28 8:50 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding General Motion Practice. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 08/28 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Allison Dorval, Sekar Kathiresan, Verve Therapeutics, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 08/28 8:45 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/27 3:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10572389 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Thomas Oldroyd.(Baker, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PSLRA Certification,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Category Form,
Att: 4 Request for Summons