Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00729
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 3:40 AM CST
Defendant
Darragh Company
Plaintiff
Robert L Bush
812 Carver Lane
Jacksonville, AR 72076

GPO Aug 27 2024
ORDER pursuant to General Order 29 provisionally granting the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed at the Direction of the Court on on 8/27/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Tue 10/22 9:30 AM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with8 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/22/2024. (ajj)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 10/22 9:23 AM
ORDER denying5 motion; and dismissing2 Complaint and6 Amended Complaint, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/22/2024. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 motion Extend Time Fri 10/18 3:16 PM
MOTION for Extension to Sue by Robert L Bush. (jap)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/20 4:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Darragh Company filed by Robert L Bush.(cmn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time Thu 09/19 3:29 PM
MOTION to Extend Time filed by Robert L Bush. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/04 4:50 PM
ORDER granting1 Plaintiff Robert Bush's motion to proceed in forma pauperis; giving Mr. Bush until Monday, 10/21/2024 to file an amended complaint, if he chooses; and directing Mr. Bush to attach to his amended complaint the Charge of Discrimination he filed with the EEOC. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 09/04/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 4:01 PM
ORDER pursuant to General Order 29 provisionally granting the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed at the Direction of the Court on on 8/27/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 08/27 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against Darragh, filed by Robert L Bush.(jak)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/27 3:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert L Bush. (jak)
Related: [-]