Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:24-bk-33934
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024

Debtor
Creative Technologies, LLC
2732 Grand Ave Ste 122
Everett, WA 98201
Represented By
Creative Technologies, LLC
contact info
Daniel Forest Newman
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Ava L Schoen
Tonkon Torp LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 9:16 AM CST
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Cersonsky & McAnelly, P.C. 1770 St. James Place, Suite 150
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Jacquelyn Diane McAnelly
Cersonsky & Mcanelly, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
H2O Station Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Corinne Samler Brennan
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Alyssa M. Radovanovich
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
First Fed Bank
Represented By
Andrew J Geppert
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Gregory R Fox
Lane Powell
contact info
Creditor
Cadence Bank
235 Peachtree Street NE Suite 1900
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
Michael R Rethinger
Burke Moore Law Group, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bexar County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Don Stecker 112 E. Pecan Street, Suite 2200
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ally Bank c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC
4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS
Oklahoma City, OK 73118
Creditor
Alkaline Water Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Corinne Samler Brennan
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Alyssa M. Radovanovich
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
352 Capital GP LLC
Represented By
Michael Paul Jones
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Jason Patrick Kathman
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Peter John Behmke
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Scott Sonny Balber
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ideal Property Investments, LLC
155 NE 100th St., Suite 205
Seattle, WA 98125
Represented By
Dominique Renee Scalia
Dbs Law
contact info
Creditor
James Group International, LLC
17713 15th Ave NE Ste 101
Shoreline, WA 98155
Represented By
Martin J Kreshon, III
North City Law, PC
contact info
Creditor
Keystone Water Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Corinne Samler Brennan
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Alyssa M. Radovanovich
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Creditor
Seaga Manufacturing, Inc.
2902 McFarland Road Suite 400
Rockford, IL 61107
Represented By
Jamie S Cassel
Reno & Zahm LLP
contact info
Creditor
Snohomish Public Utility District No. 1
Represented By
Terrence Todd Egland
Csd Attorneys At Law P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Tokyo Century (USA) Inc. assignee of Isuzu Finance of America, Inc.
101 W. Grand Avenue Suite 404
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Dennis A Dressler
Dressler Peters LLC
contact info
Creditor
TurningPointe, LLC
Represented By
J. Seth Moore
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Zachary A. Cooper
Snell Wilmer
contact info
Amit D Ranade
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, in its capacity as Indenture Trustee under the Indenture dated April 29, 2022, between Water Station Management LLC, as Issuer, & U.S. Bank Trust Co.
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
David Robert Eastlake
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Michael B. Fisco
Greenberg Taurig, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Water for Commerce Fund Management, LLC
Represented By
Kyle S. Hirsch
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Coldwater Vending LLC
8272 Sunset Blvd., Ste. B
West Hollywood, CA 90046
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Rosewater Ventures LLC
8272 Sunset Blvd., Ste. B
West Hollywood, CA 90046
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Don Gray
23233 N. Pima Rd., Ste 113-367
Scottsdale, AZ 85255
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Gray Family Enterprises LLC
23233 N. Pima Rd., Ste 113-367
Scottsdale, AZ 85255
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
David Grillo
8272 Sunset Blvd., Ste. B
West Hollywood, CA 90046
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Stillwater Ventures LLC
8272 Sunset Blvd., Ste. B
West Hollywood, CA 90046
Represented By
Ericka Johnson
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Ha Minh Nguyen
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Saturday, November 16, 2024
133 133 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/16 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 11/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 132 Generic Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
132 132 order Generic Order Thu 11/14 8:32 AM
Order Transferring Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1412 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1014(A), Signed on 11/14/2024 (abm4)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 11/14 8:36 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. Case transferred out of district to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Washington. (abm4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
131 131 misc Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/12 1:46 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creative Technologies, LLC (Newman, Daniel)
Related: [-]