California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:24-bk-15012
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Oakridge Property CMBS LLC
4016 Grand Ave Ste B
Chino, CA 91710-5491
Represented By
Jonathan Seligmann Shenson
Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman & Machtinger LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
144 144 answer Response Wed 05/14 1:42 PM
Response to Related [+] United States Trustee's Statement Re: Motion to Assume & Assign Sale, Purchase, and Escrow Agreement to Acquire The Westfield Oakridge Shopping Center With Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (RS) (Matin, Ali)
Related: [-] 130 Motion - Notice of Motion and Motion To Assume & Assign Sale, Purchase, And Escrow Agreement To Acquire The Westfield Oakridge Shopping Center filed by Debtor Oakridge Property CMBS LLC
Friday, May 09, 2025
143 143 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/09 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 139 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
142 142 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/09 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 138 Motion for relief from the automatic stay PERSONAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)
141 141 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/09 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 137 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
140 140 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/09 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 136 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
139 139 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Wed 05/07 12:19 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing (BNC-PDF) The hearing regarding the Continued Status Conference re: Chapter 11, is hereby rescheduled from May 22, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. to May 29, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Related [+] Signed on 5/7/2025 (SM6)
Related: [-] 1
138 138 order Relief from stay - PERSONAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Wed 05/07 12:17 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing (BNC-PDF) The hearing regarding the Continued Notice of Motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations PERSONAL PROPERTY Re: Nonrefundable escrow deposit in connection with he purchase of a shopping center commonly known as Westfield Oakridge in San Jose, California, is hereby rescheduled from May 22, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. to May 29, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Related [+] Signed on 5/7/2025 (SM6)
Related: [-] 32
137 137 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 05/07 12:15 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing (BNC-PDF) The hearing regarding the Continued Creditor's Motion for Entry of Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Case, is hereby rescheduled from May 22, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. to May 29, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Signed on 5/7/2025 Related [+]. (SM6)
Related: [-] 65 Dismiss Debtor filed by Creditor Oakridge Mall LLC
136 136 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Wed 05/07 12:10 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing (BNC-PDF) The hearing regarding the Debtor's Motion to Assume and Assign Sale, Purchase, and Escrow Agreement to Acquire the Westfield Oakridge Shopping Center, is hereby rescheduled from May 22, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. to May 29, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. Related [+] Signed on 5/7/2025 (SM6)
Related: [-] 130
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 05/07 12:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 05/29/2025 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 302Riverside, CA 92501 for130 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 130 GENERIC MOTION filed by Oakridge Property CMBS LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 05/07 12:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 05/29/2025 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 302Riverside, CA 92501 for65 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 65 DISMISS DEBTOR filed by Oakridge Mall LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 05/07 12:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Hearing to be held on 05/29/2025 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 302Riverside, CA 92501 for32 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY - PERSONAL PROPERTY filed by Oakridge Mall LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 05/07 12:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 05/29/2025 at 01:30 PM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 302Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 VOLUNTARY PETITION (CHAPTER 11) filed by Oakridge Property CMBS LLC